Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMurphy v. United States Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityFt. Lauderdale
Case Number0:2010cv61638
Date Filed2010-09-07
Date Closed2011-09-29
JudgeJudge William P. Dimitrouleas
PlaintiffEugene Washington Murphy
DefendantUnited States Department of State The Freedom of Information Department
AppealEleventh Circuit 11-14778
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-09-071COMPLAINT against United States Department of State. IFP Filed, filed by Eugene Washington Murphy. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vt) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
2010-09-072Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. (vt) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
2010-09-073MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Washington Murphy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(vt) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
2010-09-134ORDER granting in part 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2010. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-135ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2010. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-136Order Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2010. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar