Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMullen v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2010cv02562
Date Filed2010-09-14
Date Closed2013-08-26
JudgeJudge Marvin J. Garbis
PlaintiffWilliams Mullen
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-09-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637016185.), filed by Williams Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Civil Cover Sheet)(rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
2010-09-142Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
2010-09-173AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, and Cover Sheet served on Eric Holder on September 16, 2010, filed by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-09-174(FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon, Complaint and Exhibits, and Cover Sheet served on Rod J. Rosenstein on September 16, 2010, filed by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) Modified on 9/20/2010 (bmh, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-09-205SUMMONS Returned Executed by Williams Mullen. United States Department of Justice served on 9/16/2010, answer due 11/15/2010. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
2010-10-216Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by United States Department of Justice Responses due by 11/8/2010 (Glickson, Melanie) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
2010-10-217PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Extension of Time until December 20, 2010 for Defendants to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 10/21/10. (Garbis, Marvin) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
2010-11-09Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2010 before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
2010-11-098SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/9/10. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
2011-03-239NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Ronald Baldwin on behalf of United States Department of Justice (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
2011-04-05Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2011 before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
2011-04-0510THIRD SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/5/11. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
2011-06-2911STATUS REPORT by Williams Mullen, United States Department of Justice. (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
2011-07-0512MARGINAL ORDER approving 11 Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 7/1/11. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
2011-08-1113STATUS REPORT by Williams Mullen, United States Department of Justice. (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
2011-08-2414Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by United States Department of Justice Responses due by 9/12/2011 (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
2011-08-2515PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion for Extension of Time until August 31, 2011 to file a status report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 08/25/11. (Garbis, Marvin) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
2011-08-3116STATUS REPORT by Williams Mullen, United States Department of Justice. (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
2011-09-1317MARGINAL ORDER aproving 16 Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 9/7/11. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
2012-02-0218Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 21, 2012 by United States Department of Justice Responses due by 2/21/2012 (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
2012-02-0319PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Extension of Time until February 21, 2012 for the parties to submit a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 02/03/12. (Garbis, Marvin) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
2012-02-2120STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Williams Mullen, United States Department of Justice. (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-2321STATUS REPORT -Amended, Joint by Williams Mullen, United States Department of Justice. (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
2012-02-2322MARGINAL ORDER approving 20 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/22/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
2012-02-2723MARGINAL ORDER approving 21 Amended Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/24/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
2012-03-1524Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joist Status Report by United States Department of Justice Responses due by 4/2/2012 (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
2012-03-1625MARGINAL ORDER granting 24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/15/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
2012-04-1926STATUS REPORT by Williams Mullen, United States Department of Justice. (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
2012-04-1927MARGINAL ORDER approving 26 Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/19/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
2012-05-1528STATUS REPORT by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-05-1529ORDER Approving 28 Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/15/12 (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-06-1530STATUS REPORT by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
2012-06-1831MARGINAL ORDER approving 30 Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/18/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
2012-07-2732STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
2012-07-2733MARGINAL ORDER approving 32 Status Report filed by Williams Mullen. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 7/27/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
2012-09-2734STATUS REPORT Joint by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
2012-10-0235MARGINAL ORDER approving 34 Status Report filed by Williams Mullen. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 10/2/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
2012-11-2736STATUS REPORT by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
2012-11-2937MARGINAL ORDER approving 36 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/28/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
2012-12-1938STATUS REPORT Joint by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-2039MARGINAL ORDER approving 38 Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/19/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2013-01-1540STATUS REPORT Joint by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
2013-01-1741MARGINAL ORDER approving 40 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/15/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
2013-02-1342STATUS REPORT Joint by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
2013-02-1443MARGINAL ORDER approving 42 Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/14/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
2013-03-1444STATUS REPORT Joint by Williams Mullen. (Remenick, James) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
2013-03-1545MARGINAL ORDER approving 44 Status Report filed by Williams Mullen. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/15/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
2013-05-0246STATUS REPORT Joint by United States Department of Justice. (Baldwin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
2013-05-0647MARGINAL ORDER approving 46 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/6/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
2013-08-2648ORDER Staying and Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/26/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar