Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHerron v. Drug Enforcement Administration
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2010cv03868
Date Filed2010-08-30
Date Closed2011-04-06
JudgeMagistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull
PlaintiffCamilla Herron
DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [6]
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-301COMPLAINT for Damages or (1) Improper Withholding of Agency Records (Summons Issued) against Drug Enforcement Administration ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008018). Filed by Camilla Herron. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
2010-08-302Summons Issued as to Drug Enforcement Administration. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
2010-08-303ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
2010-08-30CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar