Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRubman v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2010cv05356
Date Filed2010-08-25
Date Closed2011-04-12
JudgeHonorable Milton I. Shadur
PlaintiffDavid Rubman
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [9]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-251COMPLAINT filed by David Rubman; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5152638. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Rubman, David) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
2010-08-25CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Milton I. Shadur. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Gilbert. (lcw, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
2010-08-252CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rubman, David) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
2010-08-263MOTION by Plaintiff David RubmanIssuance of Summonses with Modified Return Date (Rubman, David) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-264NOTICE of Motion by David Rubman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 3 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/31/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Rubman, David) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-275ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Rubman by David Rubman Pro Se (Rubman, David) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
2010-08-316MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Case called for motion hearing. Plaintiff's Motion for issuance of summons with modified return date 3 is denied for failure of movant to appear when noticed up. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
2010-09-207NOTICE of Motion by David Rubman for presentment of before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/23/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Motion For Issuance of Summons)(Rubman, David) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
2010-09-218Motion for Issuance of Summons by David Rubman (Rubman, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
2010-09-239WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/23/2010: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for issuance of summonses with modified return date is granted. The Clerk is directed to issue summons with the defendant to respond to the Complaint within 30 days. A status hearing is set for November 12, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. [ For further details see Order.] Mailed notice(hp, ) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
2010-09-27SUMMONS Issued as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ef, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-10-2110DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Department of Justice (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
2010-10-2211DESIGNATION of Harpreet Kaur Chahal as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Department of Justice (Chahal, Harpreet) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
2010-11-1212MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Status hearing held on 11/12/2010. Status hearing set for 1/14/2011 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar