Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2010-08-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Michelle S. Meier ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637016127.), filed by Michelle S. Meier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2010) |
2010-09-22 | 2 | ORDER directing the Clerk send copy of this Order and 3 summonses in blank to Plaintiff, who shall compete them and return them to the Clerk; upon receipt the Clerk shall prepare and issue summons to Plaintiff fo that she may effect service of process on Defendant. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/22/2010. (c/m 9/23/2010 (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2010) |
2010-09-30 | 3 | Summons Issued 60 days as to John M. McHugh, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2010) |
2010-11-01 | 4 | MOTION for Extension of Time by John M. McHugh Responses due by 11/18/2010 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 11/01/2010) |
2010-11-01 | 5 | PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/1/10. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 11/01/2010) |
2010-12-02 | 6 | SUMMONS Returned Executed on John M. McHugh served on 10/12/2010, Eric Holder on 10/14/2010 and Rod Rosenstein on 10/5/2010 answer due 12/13/2010. with Attachments (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/07/2010) |
2011-01-05 | 7 | MOTION to Dismiss by John M. McHugh Responses due by 1/24/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Barnard, Thomas) Modified on 1/7/2011 (rank, Deputy Clerk).(Hard Copy rec'd 1/7/2011 rk) (Entered: 01/05/2011) |
2011-01-06 | 8 | Correspondence re: Rule 12/56 letter to plaintiff. (c/m 1/6/11) (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2011) |
2011-01-19 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Michelle S. Meier Responses due by 2/7/2011 (ranks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/19/2011) |
2011-01-19 | 10 | PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 7 Motion to Dismiss (to 3/15/11). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/19/11. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 01/19/2011) |
2011-03-14 | 11 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Michelle S. Meier Responses due by 3/31/2011 (ranks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/14/2011) |
2011-03-14 | 12 | PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/14/11. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 03/14/2011) |
2011-05-16 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to dismiss to and including 7/18/2011 by Michelle S. Meier Responses due by 6/3/2011 (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/16/2011) |
2011-05-17 | 14 | PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/17/11. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 05/17/2011) |
2011-07-11 | 15 | ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/8/2011. (c/m 7/11/2011(ranks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2011) |
Hide Docket Events |