Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleM.C. v. Sebelius et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2010cv03755
Date Filed2010-08-26
Date Closed2010-11-08
JudgeSenior Judge Paul A. Magnuson
PlaintiffM. C. by and through her guardian, Angela Henderson
DefendantKathleen G. Sebelius in her Official Capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantDonald Berwick in his Official Capacity as Administrtor of the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
DefendantDr. Sanne Magnan in her Official Capacity as Commissioner of the Minnesota Department of Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [2]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-261COMPLAINT against Donald Berwick, Sanne Magnan, Kathleen G. Sebelius ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-47990.) assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, filed by M. C. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (VEM) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-26Summons Issued as to Donald Berwick, Sanne Magnan, Kathleen G. Sebelius. (VEM) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-302ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/30/10. (kll) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
2010-08-303TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. Judge Richard H. Kyle no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv3755 PAM/JJK . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
2010-09-094DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. C.. Donald Berwick served on 8/30/2010, answer due 10/29/2010; Sanne Magnan served on 8/31/2010, answer due 11/1/2010; Kathleen G. Sebelius served on 9/1/2010, answer due 11/1/2010. (Kosieradzki, Mark) Modified on 10/14/2010 (akl). (Entered: 09/09/2010)
2010-09-225NOTICE of Appearance by D Gerald Wilhelm on behalf of Kathleen G. Sebelius. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
2010-10-146SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. C.. Donald Berwick served on 10/5/2010, answer due 12/6/2010; Sanne Magnan served on 10/5/2010, answer due 12/6/2010; Kathleen G. Sebelius served on 10/5/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Kosieradzki, Mark) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
2010-11-057NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by M. C. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar