Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAbdelfattah v. USCIS National Records Center
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CityKansas City
Case Number4:2010cv00830
Date Filed2010-08-23
Date Closed2010-12-16
JudgeDistrict Judge Gary A. Fenner
PlaintiffOsama Abdelfattah
DefendantUSCIS National Records Center United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-231COMPLAINT against USCIS National Records Center filed by Osama Abdelfattah. Filing fee $350, receipt number KCMO006181. Service due by 12/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Jan) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
2010-08-252Notice of EAP assignment to an outside mediator sent via regular mail to plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order)(Martin, Jan) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
2010-08-26SUMMONS ISSUED as to USCIS National Records Center, US Attorney. and Attorney General. Modified on 8/30/2010 to reflect summons issuance to correct parties (Martin, Jan). (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-10-084RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Osama Abdelfattah. USCIS National Records Center served on 8/31/2010. (McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-10-085RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Osama Abdelfattah. Attorney General of the United States served on 9/3/2010. (McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-10-086RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Osama Abdelfattah. United States Attorney's Office served on 8/30/2010, answer due 10/29/2010. (McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-10-297MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of USCIS National Records Center. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/15/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
2010-11-018MOTION for default judgment or in the Alternative MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Osama Abdelfattah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/18/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/26/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court (McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
2010-11-019SUGGESTIONS in support re 8 MOTION for default judgment MOTION for partial summary judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Osama Abdelfattah. (Related document(s) 8 ) (McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
2010-11-1210MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction over the subject matter or, in the alternative, failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted (with supporting suggestions incorporated) filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of USCIS National Records Center. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/2/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
2010-11-1211SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 8 MOTION for default judgment MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant USCIS National Records Center. Reply suggestions due by 12/2/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 8 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
2010-11-1712ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer USCIS National Records Center answer due 11/12/2010. Signed on 11/17/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar