Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleColeman v. Drug Enforcement Administration
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2010cv00927
Date Filed2010-08-19
Date Closed2013-09-24
JudgeDistrict Judge Gerald Bruce Lee
PlaintiffJohn J. Coleman
DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration
AppealFourth Circuit 11-1999
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-191COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration filed by John J. Coleman(Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 14683015598). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Receipt)(pmil) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
2010-08-19No Service issued, pltf pro se to return with service documents in the near future. (pmil) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
2010-08-202Summons Issued for service by Certified Mail as to Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pmil) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
2010-08-253Certificate of Reporting Service as to the U.S. Atty served on 8/21/2010, answer due 10/20/2010. (pmil) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
2010-09-304ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Drug Enforcement Administration.(Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
2010-10-065Joint MOTION Briefing Schedule by John J. Coleman, Drug Enforcement Administration. (Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
2010-10-07Notice of Correction: re: 5 Joint MOTION Briefing Schedule. The filing user has been notified to file a proposed Order. (pmil) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
2010-10-076NOTICE by Drug Enforcement Administration re 5 Joint MOTION Briefing Schedule (Proposed Order) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
2010-10-08MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. 5 Joint MOTION Briefing Schedule (clar, ) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
2010-10-127ORDER that the following briefing schedule shall control this case: Deft shall file on or before 12/20/10, their motion for summary judgment or any other dispositive motion, including supporting affidavits, and exhibits; Pltf shall file on or before 01/21/11, his opposition to deft's motion for summary judgment, or any other dispositive motion and serve it by hand delivery or by facsimile on deft; Deft shall file on or before 01/25/11, their reply to pltf's opposition to their motion for summary judgment or any other dispositive motion; on 01/28/11 at 10:00 a.m., deft's motion shall be heard before the Honorable Gerald Bruce Lee; All discovery and any other case management topics, such as the pretrial conferences, shall be continued until such a time as the dispositive motions are finally decided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/12/10. (pmil) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-12-208NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Ann Edelstein on behalf of Drug Enforcement Administration (Edelstein, Julie) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2010-12-209MOTION for Summary Judgment by Drug Enforcement Administration. (Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2010-12-2010Memorandum in Support re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 5 (continued), # 5 Exhibit 6-7, # 6 Exhibit Attachment A)(Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2010-12-2011Roseboro Notice as to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Drug Enforcement Administration (Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2010-12-2012Notice of Hearing Date set for January 28, 2011 re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2010-12-21Set Deadlines as to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
2011-01-2013MOTION to Strike 4 Answer to Complaint by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(WILL NOTICE) (pmil) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
2011-01-2014Memorandum in Support of 13 MOTION to Strike 4 Answer to Complaint filed by John J. Coleman. (pmil) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
2011-01-2017AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(clar, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
2011-01-2018Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's 17 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service, # 2 Exhibit PEX 1 part 1, # 3 Exhibit PEX 1 part 2, # 4 Exhibit PEX 1 part 3, # 5 Exhibit PEX 1 part 4, # 6 Exhibit PEX 2, # 7 Exhibit PEX 3, # 8 Exhibit PEX 4, # 9 Exhibit PEX 5, # 10 Exhibit PEX 6, # 11 Exhibit PEX 7, # 12 Exhibit PEX 8, # 13 Exhibit PEX 9, # 14 Exhibit PEX 10, # 15 Exhibit PEX 11, # 16 Exhibit PEX 12, # 17 Exhibit PEX 13, # 18 Exhibit PEX 14, # 19 Exhibit PEX 15, # 20 Exhibit PEX 16, # 21 Exhibit PEX 17, # 22 Exhibit PEX 18)(clar, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
2011-01-2115MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Declaration by Mr. William C. Little, Jr. by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rban, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
2011-01-2116Memorandum in Support re 15 MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Declaration by Mr. William C. Little, Jr. filed by John J. Coleman. (rban, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
2011-01-24MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. 15 MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Declaration by Mr. William C. Little, Jr., 13 MOTION to Strike 4 Answer to Complaint (clar, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
2011-01-2519REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Declaration by Mr. William C. Little, Jr., 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration. (Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
2011-01-2520Opposition to 14 Memorandum in Support, 15 MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Declaration by Mr. William C. Little, Jr., 16 Memorandum in Support, 13 MOTION to Strike 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Drug Enforcement Administration. (Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
2011-01-26Notice of Correction re: 20 Opposition. The filing user has been notified, for future reference, that it is only necessary to link the Opposition to the related Motion(s). (pmil) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
2011-01-2821Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2011 re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration. Appearances: John Coleman, pro se, and Yiris Cornwall for United States, Drug Enforcement Admin. Pltff answered the Court's inquiry, stating that he has not paid the fee. Deft's motion for summary judgment heard and T.U.A. (Court Reporter R. Wilson.) (tbul, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-02-1622JOINT MOTION for Hearing by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Proposed Order)(pmil) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-03-1423MEMORANDUM ORDER that Deft Drug Enforcement Administration's (DEA) 9 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 03/14/11. (pmil) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
2011-03-1424FINAL JUDGMENT be ENTERED in favor of the Drug Enforcement Administration against John J. Coleman pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 03/14/11. (pmil) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
2011-03-1525JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of the Drug Enforcement Administration against John J. Coleman. (Entered by Clerk of Court on 03/15/11) (pmil) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
2011-03-2526MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment/ 23 Order by John J. Coleman. (TOLD TO NOTICE) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(pmil) Modified on 5/10/2011 Motion untermed per 5/3/2011 order (stas). (Entered: 03/25/2011)
2011-03-2527Memorandum of Law in Support of 26 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment/ 23 Order filed by John J. Coleman. (pmil) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
2011-04-0428Opposition to 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 23 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration. (Cornwall, Yiris) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
2011-04-2929MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline for Notice of Hearing by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(clar, ) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-05-0230NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 29 MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline for Notice of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, ) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-05-02MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. 29 MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline for Notice of Hearing (clar, ) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-05-0331ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/3/2011. (Davis, Ivan) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
2011-05-1032NOTICE of Hearing on 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 23 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (stas) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
2011-05-10Notice of Correction re: 32 NOTICE of Hearing on 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 23 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. The pltf pro se has been notified to file an Amended Notice of Hearing Date, as the Notice of Hearing Date set an untimely hearing. (stas) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
2011-05-1733Amended NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 23 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(rban, ) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
2011-06-03Reset Deadlines as to 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 23 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. - Motion Hearing reset per GBL chambers for 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (tche) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
2011-06-08Per GBL chambers motions set for 6/15/11 on papers(clar, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
2011-07-1434MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Pltf's 26 Motion to Alter or Amend a Judgment is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 07/14/11. (pmil) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
2011-09-1235NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 24 Fianl Judgment dated 3/14/11, 23 Memorandum Order dated 3/14/11, 25 Clerk's Judgment dated 3/15/11, 34 Memorandum Opinion and Order dated 7/14/11 by John J. Coleman. Filing fee $ 455 R# 14683024121. Copy mailed to pltf. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(nmck, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
2011-09-1436Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 35 Notice of Appeal, (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (nmck, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
2011-09-2037USCA Case Number 11-1999 4th Circuit, Case Manager B. Bain for 35 Notice of Appeal filed by John J. Coleman. (pmil) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
2011-09-2038Letter to Court from USCA, please transmit the record to this office. (pmil) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
2011-09-23Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re: 35 Notice of Appeal (nmck) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
2012-07-2439Transcript Order Acknowledgement from USCA Court Reporter R. Wilson re 35 Notice of Appeal. (gwal, ) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
2012-08-0940TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of January 28, 2011, before Judge Gerald Bruce Lee, re 39 Appeal Remark Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia Wilson, Telephone number,703-501-1580. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS: The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? n Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2012.(wilson, renecia) (Main Document 40 replaced on 9/11/2012) (gwal, ). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
2013-05-0241PUBLISHED Opinion of USCA, decided 5/2/2013 re 35 Notice of Appeal, Reversed and Remanded. (rban, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
2013-05-0242USCA JUDGMENT as to 35 Notice of Appeal, filed by John J. Coleman. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is reversed. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with FRAP 41. (rban, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
2013-06-1843ORDER of USCA as to 35 Notice of Appeal filed by John J. Coleman. Costs for these proceedings are taxed and certified in the amount of $629.10, as itemized in the accompanying bill of costs. The costs taxed shall be added to this court's mandate in accordance with FRAP 39(d). (pmil) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
2013-06-2444USCA Mandate re 35 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 5/2/13, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of FRAP. (rban, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
2013-07-1245The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to submit supplemental briefing addressing the following issues: (see Order for details); The parties shall simultaneously file their respective briefs by Friday, 08/02/13 at 5:00 p.m. The parties shall file their reply briefs by Friday, 08/09/13 at 5:00 p.m. . Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 07/12/13. (pmil) (ORDER VACATED PER ORDER OF GBL 07/22/13) Modified on 7/22/2013 to add text (pmil). (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-1946NOTICE of Appearance by Walton Davis Morris, Jr on behalf of John J. Coleman (Morris, Walton) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-1947NOTICE of Appearance by David Moskowitz on behalf of Drug Enforcement Administration (Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-1948Joint MOTION to Stay by John J. Coleman, Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, David) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-2249ORDER that the parties' 48 Joint Motion to Stay is GRANTED; the present litigation is STAYED and held in abeyance for sixty days; the Court's 07/12/13 scheduling order (Docket #45) is VACATED; if no settlement is reached within sixty days, the parties shall submit a status report providing a proposal for resolving any remaining issues or a request that the stay be extended for a period of time. Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 07/22/13. (pmil) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-07-2450First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Stotter and Certification of Local Counsel Walton D. Morris, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3603630. by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Courts to Which Applicant Is Admitted)(Morris, Walton) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
2013-07-2451ORDER granting 50 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 07/24/13. (pmil) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar