Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUBIC v. SALAZAR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
City
Case Number1:2010cv01361
Date Filed2010-08-13
Date Closed2011-10-11
Judge
PlaintiffCHRISTINE A. JUBIC
DefendantKEN SALAZAR Secretary, United States Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-131COMPLAINT against KEN SALAZAR (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by CHRISTINE A. JUBIC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
2010-08-13SUMMONS (3) Issued as to KEN SALAZAR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
2010-08-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTINE A. JUBIC. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
2010-08-13FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/12/10. "Leave to file without prepayment of cost granted" (jf, ) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
2010-08-273RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 8/26/2010., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed in a FOIA Case as to the U.S. Attorney for DC; served on 8/26/2010, answer due 9/27/2010. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
2010-08-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on 08/26/2010. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
2010-09-275Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by KEN SALAZAR (Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-11-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants consent motion 5 for an extension through November 27, 2010 of the deadline to respond to the complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/22/2010. (DCL) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
2010-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Responses to the Complaint due by 11/27/2010 (hs) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
2010-11-296ANSWER to 1 Complaint by KEN SALAZAR. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
2010-11-297NOTICE of Filing Defendant's Proposed Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions by KEN SALAZAR (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
2011-01-078SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due February 28, 2011. See Order for additional deadlines and information. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 01/07/2011. (DCL) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
2011-01-10Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2011. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2011. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2011. (hs) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
2011-02-249NOTICE (Consent) by KEN SALAZAR re 8 Scheduling Order (Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
2011-03-29Case randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge James E. Boasberg. Judge Richard W. Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
2011-03-3110NOTICE (Consent) by KEN SALAZAR (Abel, Charlotte) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
2011-04-0111NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Josh Hildreth on behalf of KEN SALAZAR Substituting for attorney Charlotte Abel (Hildreth, Josh) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
2011-04-2812NOTICE (Consent) by KEN SALAZAR (Hildreth, Josh) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
2011-04-29MINUTE ORDER: In filing their Consent Notice to extend certain deadlines, the parties have complied with the procedures established by the judge to whom this case was previously assigned. This MINUTE ORDER is to inform the parties that Judge Boasberg requires that any future extension be sought by motion. Motions that are consented to are generally looked favorably upon. The deadlines set out in 12 Consent Notice are hereby approved. Dispositive Motions shall be due May 27, 2011; Oppositions shall be due July 1, 2011; and Replies shall be due July 29, 2011. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/29/2011. (lcjeb2) Modified on 4/29/2011 (ad). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
2011-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2011; Oppositions due by 7/1/2011; Replies due by 7/29/2011. (ad) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
2011-05-2713MOTION for Summary Judgment by KEN SALAZAR (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Hildreth, Josh) (Attachments 5 and 6 replaced on 5/31/2011 to correct sideways scanning/orientation) (znmw, ). Modified on 5/31/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/27/2011)
2011-07-2814Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 8/29/2011. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/11. (DJMAC, ) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
2011-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file her opposition or other response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 8/29/2011. (ad) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
2011-10-0715NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth Genevieve White on behalf of KEN SALAZAR Substituting for attorney Josh C. Hildreth (White, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
2011-10-1116MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/11/2011. (DJMAC, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
2011-10-1117ORDER granting 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/11/2011. (DJMAC, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar