Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEngberg v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2010cv01775
Date Filed2010-08-09
Date Closed2011-09-28
JudgeJudge Steven D. Merryday
PlaintiffEric J. Engberg
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-091COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T56592) filed by Eric J. Engberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RFK) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
2010-08-182NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 (TKD) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
2010-08-263Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice c/o U.S. Attorney. (RFK) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-10-154ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
2011-01-075**TERMINATED AND IMAGE DELETED; ATTORNEY NOTIFIED TO REDACT** CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Scarberry, Jason) Modified on 1/10/2011 (RFK). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
2011-01-106CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
2011-02-037Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Change Track Designation by Eric J. Engberg. (Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
2011-02-098ORDER granting 7 --motion to re-designate the case as a TRACK ONE case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/9/2011. (BK) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
2011-03-019MOTION for summary judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Affidavit Patricia Reiersen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Reiersen Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
2011-03-0210ORDER referring motion to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for preparation of a report and recommendation: 9 --motion by the U.S. Department of Justice for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/2/2011. (BK) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
2011-03-0911ORDER setting forth the parties' briefing schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/9/2011. (JMF) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
2011-04-0112RESPONSE in opposition re 9 MOTION for summary judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric J. Engberg. (Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
2011-04-0413MEMORANDUM in opposition re 9 Motion for summary judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (AMENDED) filed by Eric J. Engberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Shackleford Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - Composite, # 3 Exhibit C- Order dated February 11, 2011, # 4 Exhibit D - Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, # 5 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement And Release of Claims, # 6 Exhibit F - Letter from Gardner)(Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
2011-04-0814REPLY to response to motion re 9 MOTION for summary judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
2011-05-1015NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Giuffreda on behalf of Eric J. Engberg (Giuffreda, Richard) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
2011-05-1016NOTICE by Eric J. Engberg re 13 Memorandum in opposition of Filing Supplemental Exhibit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Giuffreda, Richard) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
2011-05-1617NOTICE by U.S. Department of Justice re 9 MOTION for summary judgment (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
2011-05-1618CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Department of Justice re 17 Notice (Other) (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
2011-08-0419ORDER directing the Department of Justice to file with the Clerk, on or before August 11, 2011, the Report of Investigation at issue in this matter along with a notice that the document is being filed under seal per this Order for the Court's in camera review. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 8/4/2011. (JMF) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
2011-08-1221REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 9 MOTION for summary judgment filed by U.S. Department of Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 8/12/2011. (JMF) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-09-2722ORDER adopting 21 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 9 --motion for summary dgment by U.S. Department of Justice; denying 12 --cross-motion for summary judgment; directing the Clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff, to TERMINATE any pending motion, and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/27/2011. (BK) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
2011-09-2823JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Department of Justice against Eric J. Engberg (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LYB) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar