Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCLAYBROOK v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2010cv01275
Date Filed2010-07-27
Date Closed2011-05-24
JudgeJudge Robert L. Wilkins
PlaintiffMONTAGUE S. CLAYBROOK in his capacity as the Chapter 7 Trustee for the estate of Downey Financial Corp.
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-07-271COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616031565) filed by MONTAGUE S. CLAYBROOK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
2010-07-27SUMMONS (3) Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
2010-08-172RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed in a FOIA Case as to the U.S. Attorney for DC; INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 8/10/2010, answer due 9/9/2010 for U.S. Attorney. (Patella, Raymond) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
2010-08-243RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 08/11/2010. (Stassen, William) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
2010-08-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 8/10/2010 (Stassen, William) Modified on 8/25/2010 to add date served (jf, ). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
2010-09-075ANSWER to 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Campbell, Brittney) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
2010-10-116ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for November 5, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. Joint written report reflecting proposal for the schedule upon which this case should proceed due five business days prior. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/11/10. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
2010-10-12Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2010 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (hs) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-10-187MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter C. Buckley, :Firm- Fox Rothschild LLP, :Address- 2000 Market Street, 20th Floor, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - 215-299-2854. Fax No. - 215-299-2150 by MONTAGUE S. CLAYBROOK (Stassen, William) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/19/2010) (jf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (jf, ). (Entered: 10/18/2010)
2010-10-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Montague S. Claybrook's motion 7 to admit Attorney Peter C. Buckley pro hac vice be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/25/10. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
2010-10-298MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Campbell, Brittney) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
2010-11-059SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/5/10. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
2010-11-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Roberts: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/5/2010. Scheduling Order to issue via chambers. (Court Reporter Scott L. Wallace.) (hs) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
2011-01-21Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Robert L. Wilkins. Judge Richard W. Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
2011-02-2810MOTION for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Channpreet Singh, # 2 Exhibit A to Singh Declaration, # 3 Declaration Supplemental Channpreet Sing, # 4 Declaration John Rodriguez, # 5 Declaration Leo Carey, # 6 Declaration Le Hashimoto, # 7 Declaration Brittney Campbell, # 8 Exhibit A Campbell Declaration, # 9 Exhibit B Campbell Declaration, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Brittney) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
2011-03-3011MOTION to Suspend Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Pending Motion for Summary Judgment by MONTAGUE S. CLAYBROOK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Patella, Raymond) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
2011-03-31Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/1/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Robert L. Wilkins. (tcb) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
2011-04-0112ORDER granting 11 MOTION TO SUSPEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; it is hereby ORDERED that the Briefing Schedule on the Defendants Pending Motion for SummaryJudgment as set forth in the Scheduling Order entered November 5, 2010 [DE # 9] shall be suspended until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/1/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
2011-04-26MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report, not longer than three pages in length, by April 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/26/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
2011-04-2813STATUS REPORT (Joint) by MONTAGUE S. CLAYBROOK, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Stassen, William) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
2011-05-2414STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MONTAGUE S. CLAYBROOK. (Stassen, William) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
2011-05-2415STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/24/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar