Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTaggart v. Office of Inspector General (OIG) et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
City
Case Number1:2010cv05447
Date Filed2010-07-19
Date Closed2011-09-26
Judge
PlaintiffCynthia C. Taggart
DefendantOffice of Inspector General (OIG)
DefendantOffice of Professional Responsibility (OPR)
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
DefendantUnited States Executive Offices of U.S. Attorneys (EOUSA)
DefendantOffice of Information Policy (OIP)
AppealSecond Circuit 12-3435
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-07-191ENDORSEMENT on Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, I.F.P. REQUEST IS GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/16/10) (rdz) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
2010-07-192COMPLAINT against Office of Inspector General (OIG), Office of Professional Responsibility (OPR), Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), United States Executive Offices of U.S. Attorneys (EOUSA), Office of Information Policy (OIP). Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart.(rdz) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
2010-07-19SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of Inspector General (OIG), Office of Professional Responsibility (OPR), Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), United States Executive Offices of U.S. Attorneys (EOUSA), Office of Information Policy (OIP). (rdz) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
2010-07-19Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (rdz) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
2010-07-26Pro Se Manual sent to litigant at the address noted on complaint on 07/22/10 via regular mail. (rmj) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
2010-08-206MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Office of Inspector General (OIG) served on 8/20/2010, answer due 9/10/2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (mbe) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
2010-09-203ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended from September 20, 2010 to October 20, 2010. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/20/2010) (js) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
2010-09-245MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Office of Information Policy (OIP) served on 8/20/2010, answer due 9/10/2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (mbe) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
2010-09-274MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) served on 8/20/2010, answer due 9/10/2010. Service was accepted by Ms. Morales-Clerk. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (mbe) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-10-257ORDER: Defendants' moving papers are due by Monday, November 8, 2010; Plaintiff s opposition papers are due by Friday, December 10, 2010; Defendants' reply, if any, is due by Friday, December 17, 2010. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order, via certified mail, to Cynthia Taggart, P.O. Box 5283, West Babylon, NY 11707. Please be aware that the Pro Se office at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, Room 230, New York, New York 10007 (telephone: (212) 805-0175) may be of assistance with court procedures. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/25/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
2010-10-25Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 7 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jpo) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
2010-10-26Mailed a copy of 7 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Cynthia Taggart, P.O. Box 5283 West Babylon, NY 11707 by Certified Mail # 7002 2030 0001 2380 1906 with Return Receipt Requested. (eef) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
2010-11-048ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Cristine Irvin Phillips dated 11/3/10 re: Request for a revised briefing schedule as follows. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Motion due by 11/15/2010. Response due by 12/13/2010. Reply due by 12/20/2010.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/4/10) (cd) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
2010-11-09Received Return Receipt as to Cynthia Taggart, which was served by Certified Mail # 7002 2030 0001 2380 1906, on 11/1/2010. (ajc) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
2010-11-159MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a claim on Which Relief may be granted and MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of Information Policy (OIP), Office of Inspector General (OIG), Office of Professional Responsibility (OPR), United States Executive Offices of U.S. Attorneys (EOUSA).(mbe) Modified on 11/16/2010 (mbe). (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1510MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a claim on Which Relief may be granted and MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of Information Policy (OIP), Office of Inspector General (OIG), Office of Professional Responsibility (OPR), United States Executive Offices of U.S. Attorneys (EOUSA). (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1511DECLARATION of Cristine Irvin Phillips. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of Information Policy (OIP), Office of Inspector General (OIG), Office of Professional Responsibility (OPR), United States Executive Offices of U.S. Attorneys (EOUSA). (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1512DECLARATION of David M. Hardy. (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1513DECLARATION of Deborah Marie Waller. (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1514DECLARATION of Vanessa R. Brinkmann. (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1515DECLARATION of Vinay J. Jolly. (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1516DECLARATION of Patricia Reisersen. (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1517NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant who Opposes a Motion for Summary Judgment. (mbe) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-12-1318CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3)(mro) Modified on 12/17/2010 (ae). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2011: # 3 Exhibit)(ae).(Main Document 18 replaced on 5/11/2011)(mt). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
2010-12-1319AFFIRMATION of Cynthia C. Taggart in Opposition re: 9 Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (mro) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
2010-12-1320AFFIRMATION of Cynthia C. Taggart in Support of Plaintiff's opposition to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2010: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (ae). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
2010-12-1321MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 9 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, Reply in opposition to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and in support of plaintiff's Cross-Motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4)(mro) (Main Document 21 replaced on 12/17/2010) (ae). Modified on 12/17/2010 (ae). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2011: # 1 memorandum pt2) (mt). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
2010-12-2022REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of Information Policy (OIP), Office of Inspector General (OIG), Office of Professional Responsibility (OPR), United States Executive Offices of U.S. Attorneys (EOUSA). (mbe) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
2011-01-0424REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT, REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT in Support re: 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart. (ad) (Main Document 24 replaced on 5/11/2011) (mt). (Entered: 02/18/2011)
2011-01-0523ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Cynthia Taggart dated 12/29/10 re: I am writing to respectfully request that the Your Honor grant me more time to reply and wish to suggest that date be January 7, 2011 upon the approval of the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. ( Replies due by 1/7/2011.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/5/11) (djc) Modified on 1/13/2011 (djc). (Entered: 01/05/2011)
2011-07-1429Letter addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Cynthia Taggart dated 7/11/11 re: Plaintiff has previously requested an oral argument and is writing to request whether it is still being decided upon. Document filed by Cynthia C. Taggart.(mro) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
2011-09-2230ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No.9) is GRANTED as to the FBI, OIG, and OIP. Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is GRANTED as to EOUSA and OPR. Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Defendants' motion (Dkt. No.9), to terminate Plaintiff's cross-motion (Dkt. No. 21), and to close this case. The Clerk of the Court is further ORDERED to serve a copy of this Order, via certified mail, on Plaintiff Cynthia Taggart, P.O. Box 5283, West Babylon, NY 11707. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/19/2011) (lmb) Modified on 9/22/2011 (lmb). (Entered: 09/22/2011)
2011-09-22Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lmb) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
2011-09-22Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (lmb) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
2011-09-22Mailed a copy of 30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, to Cynthia Taggart, at P.O. Box 5283 West Babylon, NY 11707 by Certified Mail # 7001 2510 0008 7682 2823 with Return Receipt Requested. (eef) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
2011-09-2631CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated September 19, 2011, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted as to the FBI, OIG, and OIP; Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted as to EOUSA and OPR; and Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is denied; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/26/11) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
2011-09-26Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 31 Clerk's Judgment,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ml) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
2011-09-26Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: 31 Clerk's Judgment, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Cynthia C. Taggart and to Attorney(s) of Record: Cristine Irvin Phillips. (jab) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar