Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBonilla v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2010cv22168
Date Filed2010-07-01
Date Closed2011-07-25
JudgeSenior Judge James Lawrence King
PlaintiffMario Simbaqueba Bonilla
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
AppealEleventh Circuit 11-13486
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [23]
Opinion/Order [59]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-07-011COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. Filing fee $ 350.00, filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(asl) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
2010-07-012Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Senior Judge James Lawrence King (asl) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
2010-07-013Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (asl) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
2010-07-024Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/1/2010 in the amount of $ 350.00, receipt number FLS100002994 (asl) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
2010-07-095SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed United States Department of Justice served on 7/1/2010, answer due 8/30/2010. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
2010-07-136SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. United States Department of Justice by serving U.S. Attorney General on 7/9/2010, answer due 9/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt)(tp) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
2010-08-027ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Justice.(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
2010-08-118VACATED Per Order DE 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/11/2010. (jw) Modified text on 10/12/2010 (jcy). (Entered: 08/11/2010)
2010-08-189MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Order Dismissing Case by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (lh) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
2010-09-0710MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Order Dismissing Case by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
2010-09-0811ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/8/2010. (ylo) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
2010-09-0812RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Order Dismissing Case filed by United States Department of Justice. Replies due by 9/20/2010. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
2010-09-2013MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Order Dismissing Case by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (lh) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
2010-09-2114ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration due by 9/24/2010.. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/21/2010. (smr) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
2010-09-2415REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Order Dismissing Case filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (lh) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-10-1216Order Granting Reconsideration of Dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/12/2010. (jcy) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-11-1517ORDER Directing Government to Submit Documentation. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/15/2010. (jw) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
2010-12-0318MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 12/27/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (declaration) of John F. Boseker, with attached exhibits)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
2010-12-2719MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (jcy) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
2010-12-3020Order Granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/29/2010. (jcy) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
2011-01-0421RESPONSE to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Replies due by 1/14/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
2011-01-0622Notice of Filing by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla (jcy) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
2011-01-1323ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/12/2011. (jw) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-1324SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2012 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Jury Trial set for 3/26/2012 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Calendar Call set for 3/22/2012 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor. Discovery due by 11/23/2011. Motions due by 11/28/2011. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/27/2012. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/13/2011. (jw) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-1325MOTION for Discovery by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Responses due by 1/31/2011 (ls) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
2011-01-1426AMENDED ORDER re 24 Scheduling Order,. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/14/2011. (jw) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
2011-01-1427EXHIBITS by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla re: 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Related document: 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla.(jcy) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
2011-01-1828ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Motions referred to Ted E. Bandstra. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/18/2011. (jw) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
2011-01-3129RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by United States Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
2011-02-0130Notice of Pending, Refiled, or Similar Actions by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla (jcy) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-02-1431MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in his Reply in support of his Motion for Discovery by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (ls) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
2011-02-1432MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument re 25 MOTION for Discovery by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (ls) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
2011-02-1433MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 25 MOTION for Discovery by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (ls) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
2011-02-1534REPLY to Response to 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (jcy) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
2011-02-2235Notice of similar actions and procedures by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla (lk) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-02-2236Order on Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 2/22/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
2011-04-1337Order on Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 4/13/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
2011-04-1538Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Orders 2010-145 and 2011-18 to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley. (vp) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
2011-04-1539Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 5/2/2011), MOTION for Leave to Provide Any Responsive Records for In Camera Review by United States Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
2011-04-2040ORDER Granting re 39 MOTION for Leave to Provide Any Responsive Records for In Camera Review filed by United States Department of Justice. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 4/19/2011. (jw) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
2011-04-21SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 41 restricted/sealed until further notice. (vp) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
2011-04-21SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 42 restricted/sealed until further notice. (vp) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
2011-04-27SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 43 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
2011-05-0244Motion for Continuance of Motion for Summary Judgment by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Responses due by 5/19/2011 (jcy) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-05-0445MOTION for Reconsideration re 40 Order by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (jcy) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
2011-05-0546ORDER Granting 44 Motion For Extension of Time. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 5/5/2011. (jw) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
2011-05-05Reset Deadlines as to 39 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Leave to Provide Any Responsive Records for In Camera Review. Responses due by 6/17/2011 (tp) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
2011-05-1647MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Discovery Request by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (drz) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
2011-05-1948RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION for Reconsideration re 40 Order filed by United States Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
2011-05-2049ORDER Requiring Response re 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Response due by 5/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/20/2011. (rms) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
2011-05-2450Plaintiff's REPLY to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of DE 40 48 Response in Opposition to Motion by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (drz) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
2011-05-2651RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint in S.D. Ohio Case No. 2:11-cv-00062)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
2011-05-2652Order Denying Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 5/26/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
2011-06-0153ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/31/2011. (rms) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
2011-06-0854Plaintiff's Renewed MOTION for Discovery by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Responses due by 6/27/2011 (drz) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
2011-06-1455MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Discovery re 54 MOTION for Discovery by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (drz) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
2011-06-2156MOTION for a Second Enlargement of Time in which to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgement nunc-pro-tunc re 39 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Leave to Provide Any Responsive Records for In Camera Review by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (drz) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
2011-06-2257RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION for Discovery filed by United States Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
2011-06-2358Order Withdrawing Reference to Magistrate and Denying Motions for Discovery and Extension of Time. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 6/23/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
2011-07-2559ORDER Granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/25/2011. (jw) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
2011-07-2960NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Mario Simbaqueba-Bonilla re 59 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Filing Fee: (FEE NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (amb) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
2011-07-29Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order Under Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 60 Notice of Appeal, (amb) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
2011-08-0561TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla re 60 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (amb) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
2011-08-0962Acknowledgment of Receipt re 60 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. Date received by USCA: 8/3/11. USCA Case Number: 11-13486-F. (hh) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
2011-08-2263MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Mario Simbaqueba Bonilla. (amb) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
2011-08-2564ORDER Denying 63 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/24/2011. (jw) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar