Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWax v. United States Department of State et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2010cv00768
Date Filed2010-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Paul Papak
PlaintiffSteven T. Wax Federal Public Defender for the District of Oregon
DefendantUnited States Department of State
DefendantHillary Clinton Secretary of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-07-021Complaint for Injunctive Relief. Summons issued as to Defendant United States Department of State, Hillary Clinton. Filed by Plaintiff Steven T. Wax against Defendants Hillary Clinton, and United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mr) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
2010-07-022Summons Returned Executed as to Hillary Clinton served on 7/2/2010, answer due on 8/31/2010; United States Department of State served on 7/2/2010, answer due on 8/31/2010. Person specifically served: Eric J. Holder Jr., US Attorney General. Filed by Steven T. Wax. (mr) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
2010-07-023Summons Returned Executed. Personal specifically served: Lauren Cargill, US Attorney's office, District of Oregon. Filed by Steven T. Wax. (mr) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
2010-07-024Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Discovery is to be completed by 10/29/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/29/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 11/29/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (mr) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar