Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2010cv01058
Date Filed2010-06-23
Date Closed2011-10-07
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffKELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-06-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616030693) filed by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
2010-06-23SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
2010-06-232Corporate Disclosure Statement by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
2010-07-233NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
2010-07-234Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
2010-07-26MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time. UPON CONSIDERATION of defendant's consent motion for enlargement of time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant's response to plaintiff's complaint shall be filed on or before August 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 07/26/10. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
2010-07-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or respond to complaint on or before 8/23/2010, (mpt, ) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
2010-08-235Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
2010-08-26MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of Defendant's second consent motion for enlargement of time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before September 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/26/10. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or respond to complaint due by 9/7/2010, (mpt, ) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
2010-09-076Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
2010-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. In light of the parties' consent, the Court hereby GRANTS the defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/10/10. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
2010-09-247Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
2010-09-27MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Fourth Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. In light of the parties' consent and for good cause shown, it is hereby ordered that the defendant shall have until October 28, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/27/10. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
2010-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by 10/28/2010, (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
2010-10-268Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
2010-10-27MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. In light of the parties' consent, and for good cause shown, the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that if the parties have not sooner moved for dismissal of this case, the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before November 29,2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/27/2010. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
2010-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 11/29/2010 (tg, ) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
2010-11-239Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
2010-11-30MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. In light of the parties' consent, and for good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before December 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/30/2010. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
2010-12-0110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
2011-01-0711ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
2011-03-30Case randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Reggie B. Walton no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
2011-05-15MINUTE ORDER Granting 10 consent motion for enlargement of time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/15/2011, Nunc Pro Tunc to 12/1/2010. (jth) (Entered: 05/15/2011)
2011-05-15MINUTE ORDER: A Meet & Confer Initial Status Conference is set for 6/10/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 6/3/2011. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/15/2011. (jth) (Entered: 05/15/2011)
2011-06-0312MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
2011-06-0613NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Russell, Jr on behalf of KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
2011-06-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 6/10/2011. Joint Status Report is due by 7/15/2011. Summary Judgment motions are due by 8/10/2011, Responses are due by 8/31/2011, Replies are due by 9/14/2011. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam.) (jth) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-07-1514STATUS REPORT by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
2011-07-20MINUTE ORDER re 14 Status Report. The parties should update the court on the status of their negotiations on August 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/20/2011. (MT) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
2011-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties should update the court on the status of their negotiations on August 15, 2011. (jth) (Entered: 07/23/2011)
2011-08-0515Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Summary Judgment Motions by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-0816NOTICE of Proposed Order by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. re 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Summary Judgment Motions (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
2011-08-08MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Motions for summary judgment will be due 8/24/2011, the oppositions will be due 9/14/2011 and the replies will be due 9/28/2011. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/2011. (MT) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
2011-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 8/24/2011; Oppositions due by 9/14/2011; Replies are due by 9/28/2011. (jth) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
2011-08-1517STATUS REPORT JOINT by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
2011-08-16MINUTE ORDER re 17 Joint Status Report. The parties are directed to file a joint status report on 9/12/2011 if the matter has not been resolved by that time. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/16/2011. (MT) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
2011-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are directed to file a joint status report on 9/12/2011 if the matter has not been resolved by that time. (jth) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
2011-09-1218STATUS REPORT by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
2011-09-13MINUTE ORDER re 18 Joint Status Report. The parties shall submit an updated status report on 9/27/2011 unless the matter has already been dismissed by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/2011. (MT) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
2011-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit an updated status report on 9/27/2011 unless the matter has already been dismissed by that date. (jth) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
2011-09-2719STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
2011-09-28MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit an updated status report on 10/7/2011 unless the matter has already been dismissed by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/28/2011. (MT) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
2011-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Unless the matter has already been dismissed by that date, The parties shall submit an updated status report by 10/7/2011. (jth) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
2011-10-0720STIPULATION of Dismissal by KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar