Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-12-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against Department of State Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8541125 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 JS45 Local Category Form, # 4 DOS Summons, # 5 AG Summons, # 6 AUSA Summons)(Kortz, Mason) Modified on 12/7/2020: corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 12/07/2020) |
2020-12-07 | 2 | ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/07/2020) |
2020-12-07 | 3 | Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/07/2020) |
2021-02-08 | 4 | Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 26, 2021 to File Answer by Department of State.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 02/08/2021) |
2021-02-08 | 5 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Department of State answer due 2/26/2021. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 02/08/2021) |
2021-02-26 | 6 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of State.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 02/26/2021) |
2021-03-01 | 7 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties are to submit a joint proposed schedule by 3/11/21 and indicate whether they object to the court setting a schedule on the written submission.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/01/2021) |
2021-03-11 | 8 | Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2021 to File the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule by Department of State.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 03/11/2021) |
2021-03-12 | 9 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2021 to File the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 03/12/2021) |
2021-03-18 | 10 | JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Text of modified Wiretapping Request)(Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 03/18/2021) |
2021-03-19 | 11 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ENDORSED ORDER entered. APPROVING 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 03/19/2021) |
2021-05-07 | 12 | Consent MOTION To Deem Service Complete by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mason A. Kortz)(Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 05/07/2021) |
2021-05-10 | 13 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 12 Motion To Deem Service Complete. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 05/10/2021) |
2021-05-18 | 14 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by Department of State. (Weida, Jason) (Entered: 05/18/2021) |
2021-07-20 | 15 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 07/20/2021) |
2021-09-07 | 16 | Joint MOTION to Amend 11 Order by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International.(Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 09/07/2021) |
2021-09-08 | 17 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 16 Motion to Amend. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 09/08/2021) |
2021-11-05 | 18 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 11/05/2021) |
2021-12-08 | 19 | NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Department of State (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 12/08/2021) |
2022-01-28 | 20 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Modified CARSI Request)(Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 01/28/2022) |
2022-01-31 | 21 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING 20 Status Report filed by Privacy International, MuckRock Foundation, Inc. Further Status Report due by 4/22/2022.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 01/31/2022) |
2022-04-22 | 22 | STATUS REPORT Joint by Department of State. (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2022) |
2022-04-25 | 23 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING 22 Joint Status Report filed by Department of State. Further Status Report due 7/15/22.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 04/25/2022) |
2022-07-15 | 24 | NOTICE by Department of State Joint Status Report 7/15/22 (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 25 | STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Department of State. (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-12-29 | 26 | STATUS REPORT (Joint) by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 12/29/2022) |
2023-03-22 | 27 | STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Department of State. (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-06-16 | 28 | STATUS REPORT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 06/16/2023) |
2023-06-21 | 29 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING 28 Status Report filed by Privacy International, MuckRock Foundation, Inc. Further status report to be filed by 9/8/23. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 30 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Attachments: # 1 Modified Caribbean Request, # 2 Modified Technical Assistance Request)(Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-12-01 | 31 | STATUS REPORT Joint by Department of State. (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2023) |
2023-12-01 | 32 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING 31 Joint Status Report filed by Department of State. Further Status Report to be filed by 2/23/2024. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/01/2023) |
2024-02-23 | 33 | STATUS REPORT Joint by Department of State. (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2024) |
2024-02-23 | 34 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING 33 Status Report filed by Department of State. Further Status Report due by 5/23/2024. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 02/23/2024) |
2024-05-17 | 35 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 05/17/2024) |
2024-05-17 | 36 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING 35 Joint Status Report filed by Privacy International, MuckRock Foundation, Inc. Further status report to be filed by 8/9/2024.(McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 05/17/2024) |
2024-08-19 | 37 | STATUS REPORT Joint by Department of State. (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 08/19/2024) |
2024-11-01 | 38 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 11/01/2024) |
2025-01-24 | 39 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 01/24/2025) |
2025-01-24 | 40 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING 39 Status Report filed by Privacy International, MuckRock Foundation, Inc. Parties will submit a further status report by 4/18/25. (KF) (Entered: 01/24/2025) |
2025-04-02 | 41 | Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. With regards to the status report to be filed on April 18, 2025, the Court would like the parties to include an estimation of when the requests will be completed. (KF) (Entered: 04/02/2025) |
2025-04-18 | 42 | STATUS REPORT JOINT by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 04/18/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |