Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2022cv04760
Date Filed2022-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Southern California submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the treatment of hospitalized detainees and detainees released from custody prior to their death. The ACLU of Southern California also requested expediting processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted the ACLU's request for a fee waive but denied its request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Southern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security, OIG
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-121COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33617094 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Laboni A. Hoq added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California(pty:pla))(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-123NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, identifying American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement; United States Department of Homeland Security. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-124Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-135NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-136NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-137Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-138NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 4 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect days for defendant to serve a response. If the case is filed under the Freedom of Information Act, "Within 30 days" should be reflected on summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-139NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eunice Cho. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-1310CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-1811*STRICKEN - SEE DKT. NO. 13 * APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33649209) filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2022 (jgr). (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-1912NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33649209) 11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). Failed to list DC Bar membership. (lt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-2013RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The document (Dkt. No. 11 ) is stricken without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the Local Rules and regulations as indicated in the notice to filer of deficiencies (Dkt. No. 12 ). (jgr) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-2014APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33649209) filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 G-64 Payment Confirmation) (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-2115Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-2216ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, designating Michael B. Kaufman as local counsel 14 . (gk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-2517NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint 1 . The following error(s) was found: Separate attachments should clearly identify which sections of the summons the attachments belong to. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-2618Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-281930-Day Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (gk) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-1120PROOF OF SERVICE Executed American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Receptionist. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Individual. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Receptionist. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-2521STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 9/30/2022; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer now due 9/30/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-09-2922ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-2923ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on November 18, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. in Courtroom 6C. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by November 8, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-0424First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-1825Joint STIPULATION to Continue INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from 11/18/2022 to 12/9/2022 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, 23 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-1826ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 24 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG(pty:dft))(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-1827ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND CONTINUING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [Dkt. 25] by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation. The Mandatory Status Conference in this matter is continued from November 18, 2022 to December 9, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be due on or before November 29, 2022. The parties are advised that this extension will not extend the case management deadlines that will be set, and they are ordered to include this entire paragraph verbatim in their Joint Rule 26(f) Report in the statement of the case. RE: Stipulation to Continue, 25 . (aco) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-11-2928JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-3029Notice OF FILING U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT DECLARATION CONCERNING AGENCY WORKLOAD AND RESOURCES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSED PROCESSING RATE AS SET FORTH IN THE JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT (ECF 28) filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-3030(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties have stated in their joint Rule 26(f) report they "[do] not oppose reference of this matter to a Magistrate Judge." Dkt. No. 28 . The parties are to meet and confer and if the parties consent to conduct all further proceedings in this case before a Magistrate Judge, select a Magistrate Judge and file a fully executed statement of consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by no later than 9:00 a.m. on December 8, 2022. Under GO 18-11, the parties should contact the selected Magistrate Judge's chambers as follows: To confirm a particular Magistrate Judge's ability to schedule the trial in the time frame desired by the parties and/or willingness to accommodate any other special requests of the parties, please contact that Magistrate Judge's Courtroom Deputy prior to attaching Form CV-11D (Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) to a Notice of Lodging of Consent Form, which shall be e-filed as required by Local Rule 5-4.4 as a proposed document. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-0531Notice OF FILING U.S. DEPARMETN OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL DECLARATION CONCERNING AGENCY WORKLOAD AND RESOURCES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSED PROCESSING RATE AS SET FORTH IN THE JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT (ECF 28) filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
2022-12-0732NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Generic Text Only Entry,,,, 30 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-0833(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: In light of the parties' lodged notice of consent 32 , the Court VACATES the December 9 mandatory scheduling conference. No appearance from counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-0834CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:22-cv-04760 SHK. (rn) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-1235ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. KewalramaniThe parties consented to proceed to trial before Magistrate Judge Kewalramani.To advance the litigation efficiently, the Court will hold a case management conference on January 10, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Judge Kewalramani will hold the conference by video. The Court uses Zoom Webinar as its preferred video platform. The parties are to visit: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-shashih-kewalramani to obtain the zoom webinar link for the hearing (dc) (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2023-01-1036MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The parties are to further meet and confer with respect to the rate of production of documents as well as the other information that may be provided on a periodic basis, as discussed during the hearing.Defendants counsel is to provide a list of citations to cases that provide for a different rate of production than those provided by Plaintiff's counsel by 12:00 p.m. on Friday, January 13, 2023. The Court sets a further status conference by video Zoom for January 18, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (dc) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
2023-01-1837MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: As discussed on the record, the parties have reached an agreement as to the rate of review of documents by Defendants Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Department of Homeland Security- Office of Inspector General. The Court sets a further status conference by video Zoom forJanuary 24, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. to discuss the remaining review and production issues. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (dc) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-2438MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: As discussed on the record, the parties have reached an agreement as to the rate of review of documents by Defendants Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Department of Homeland Security-Office of Inspector General. The parties shall provide a stipulated proposed order with the exact agreement that has been made between the parties regarding the search, location, and the production of documents. Furthermore, the parties are to file their proposed briefing schedule for a motion for summary judgment and trial dates. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (dc) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-02-0639NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Status Conference - optional html form,, 38 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-0940ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT-Note: Change made by the Court Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, Bench Trial set for 1/17/2024 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.) (dc) (Entered: 02/09/2023)
2023-05-1241Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason K Axe counsel for Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Adding Jason K. Axe as counsel of record for U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement; U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security; U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security, OIG for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Jason K Axe added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jason K Axe added to party United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG(pty:dft), Attorney Jason K Axe added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Axe, Jason) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-06-0142STIPULATION to Continue Dispositive Motion Schedule Re: Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings 40 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Axe, Jason) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
2023-06-0543ORDER CONTINUING DISPOSITIVE MOTION SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation to Continue, 42 (dc) (Entered: 06/05/2023)
2023-07-0544NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-0545MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: As discussed on the record,Defendant has agreed to provide a response to Plaintiffs letter regarding the search terms by an anticipated date of Friday, July 7, 2023, and provide it to the Court as well. The Court sets a further status conference for July 11, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. Court Recorder: COURTSMART. (dc) (Entered: 07/06/2023)
2023-07-0746RESCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re: Status Conference - optional html form, 45 previously scheduled for July 11, 2023 10:30 AM has been rescheduled. Status Conference set for 7/13/2023 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/07/2023)
2023-07-0747MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER ON RESPONSE BY AGENCY TOPLAINTIFFS JUNE 26, 2023 LETTER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: re: Status Conference - optional html form, 45 . In light of this timeline, the Defendants' response to the June 26th letter will be provided to Plaintiffscounsel and this Court by no later than 5 p.m. PDT on Tuesday, July 11, 2023, via e-mail. A further conference will then be held on Thursday, July 13, 2023 at 3 p.m. PDT. (dc) (Entered: 07/10/2023)
2023-07-1148Notice of Filing U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Declaration Concerning Agency Workload and Resources filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-1349MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ANDDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (ECF No. 44) held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The hearing on the Motion currently set for August 8, 2023, will remain on calendar for 11:00 a.m. and it will be held by Zoom. Defendants will continue the production as previously agreed and will meet and confer to discuss search terms. A status conference regarding this issue will be discussed at the August 8, 2023 hearing. Court Recorder: COURTSMART. (dc) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-2550PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support 44 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laboni Hoq, # 2 Exhibits A-X to Hoq Declaration)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/25/2023)
2023-08-0451REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support 44 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 08/04/2023)
2023-08-0752RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE re: Status Conference - optional html form,, 49 previously scheduled for 8/8/2023 11:00 a.m. has been rescheduled. Status Conference via Zoom set for 8/11/2023 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-1153MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (ECF No. 44). The Court heard argument from the parties. Defendants will continue do their searches and meet and confer to discuss the responses and rate of productions on a rolling basis. The parties may contact the Court if the rate of production is not efficiently moving along. Furthermore, the Court took the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ("Rule 12(c) Motion") under submission and will issue its ruling on a separate order. Lastly, the substantive summary motion deadline is VACATED pending the completion of the production of documents and the Courts ruling on the Rule 12(c) Motion. Court Recorder: COURTSMART. (dc) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-2954MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THEPLEADINGS by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: RE 44 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. For the reasons discussed in this Order, Defendants' Motion is DENIED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (dc) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-10-0555MOTION for Order for Informal Discovery Dispute. Zoom Video Conference set for 10/11/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-1156MINUTES OF 55 Motion for Order; Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The Court heard argument from the parties, but the Court determined that at this time further briefing needs to be conducted to narrow the issues that Plaintiff is specifically seeking relief. Court Recorder: COURTSMART. (dc) (Entered: 10/13/2023)
2023-10-2357PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOIA PROCESSING RATE filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California re: Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,, Discovery Hearing, 56 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laboni Hoq, # 2 Exhibits A-Q to Hoq Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hoq, Laboni) Modified on 11/15/2023 (hr). (Entered: 10/23/2023)
2023-10-2658Joint STIPULATION for Order Amend the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Request for Scheduling Order and Processing Rate filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-11-0159ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Order, 58 (dc) (Entered: 11/01/2023)
2023-11-0660Opposition filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement re: Miscellaneous Document, 57 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fernando Pineiro, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2023)
2023-11-1361REPLY filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California to Miscellaneous Document, 57 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF REQUESTING SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOIA PROCESSING RATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laboni Hoq and Exhibit 1)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
2023-12-0862MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOIA PROCESSING RATE 57 by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: After reviewing the parties' arguments, for the reasons set forth in this Order, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion as outlined in the Conclusion of this Order. A Status Conference with the parties will be held on March 4, 2024 at 9:30 AMvia Zoom. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (dc) (Entered: 12/08/2023)
2023-12-2063Joint STIPULATION for Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-2164ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TODEFENDANTS DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY AND DEPARTMENT OF HOMELANDSECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Order, 63 (dc) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2024-02-0165NOTICE of Change of address by Kyle A Virgien attorney for Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. Changing attorneys address to 425 California St., Suite 700, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Virgien, Kyle) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-2366NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Eunice Cho, # 4 Exhibit A to Cho Declaration (Redacted Documents), # 5 Exhibit B to Cho Declaration (Appendix of Challenged Withholdings), # 6 Exhibits C-J to Cho Declaration, # 7 Exhibit K to Cho Declaration, # 8 Declaration of Laboni Hoq, # 9 Exhibits A-K to Hoq Declaration, # 10 Exhibit L to Hoq Declaration, # 11 Exhibits M-Q to Hoq Declaration, # 12 Exhibit R to Hoq Declaration (Defendants Search Summary), # 13 Exhibits S-X to Hoq Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Y to Hoq Declaration (Vaughn Index), # 15 Exhibits Z-AA to Hoq Declaration) (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 02/23/2024)
2024-02-2867Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General 66 Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 02/28/2024)
2024-02-2968Joint STIPULATION to Amend Order, 64 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 02/29/2024)
2024-03-0169STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/01/2024)
2024-03-0170STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 03/01/2024)
2024-03-0471ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY AND DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct 68 Hearing on Cross-Motions shall be on May 15, 2024 at 10:00 a.m., or on adate or time thereafter at the convenience of the Court. (dc) (Entered: 03/04/2024)
2024-03-0472MINUTES OF Status Conference Re 62 held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The Court held a status conference as previously scheduled. Attorneys Laboni Hoq, Eunice Cho, and Kyle Virgien appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Assistant United States Attorney Joseph Tursi and Jason Axe appeared on behalf of Defendants. Plaintiffs' shall file a Request for Further Status Conference ("Request") setting out the various of inquiries as discussed on the record. Defendants' shall file a response, if any, by March 19, 2024. The Court sets a further status conference for March 20, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. At the further status conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the categories identified on the record and areas of inquiry identified on the record and that may be part of the Request. Court Recorder: COURTSMART. Time In Court 1:20 (NO PDF ATTACHMENT) (dc) Modified on 3/4/2024 (dc). (Entered: 03/04/2024)
2024-03-0573STATUS REPORT Re Plaintiff's Request for Further Status Conference filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 03/05/2024)
2024-03-1974STATUS REPORT Re Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Further Status Conference filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/19/2024)
2024-03-2075MINUTES OF Status Conference Re Continued Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The Court held a status conference as previously scheduled. Attorneys Laboni Hoq, Eunice Cho, and Kyle Virgien appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Assistant United States Attorney Joseph Tursi and Jason Axe appeared on behalf of Defendants. The Court and the parties discussed the status of various categories of information that Plaintiff contends are responsive to the FOIA requests at issue. In an effort to reduce the number of documents that Defendant would need to review, within 14 days of this Order, Defendant will provide an supplemental response regarding its ability to identify the number of pages that are attributable to a particular custodian related to documents currently collected with respect to Mr. Gulema. If this material can be collected, and Defendant is able to provide it without extensive effort, it shall be provided to Plaintiff. Additionally, also within 14 days of this Order, Defendant will determine whether it intends to provide a Vaughn index and a declaration related to search adequacy prior to a meet and confer that Plaintiffs would seek in relation to a motion for summary judgment that Plaintiffs may seek to file. Time in Court: 1:00 Court Recorder: COURTSMART. <No PDF Attachments> (dc) (Entered: 03/20/2024)
2024-03-2576Joint STIPULATION for Order Extend Briefing Schedule On Motions For Summary Judgment Re Defendants DHS & OIG filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Axe, Jason) (Entered: 03/25/2024)
2024-03-2977ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REDEFENDANTS DHS & OIG by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Order, 76 (dc) (Entered: 03/29/2024)
2024-04-0378STATUS REPORT (SUPPLEMENTAL) Re Response to Plaintiff's Request for Further Status Conference filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/03/2024)
2024-04-1079NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Motion set for hearing on 5/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 2 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 3 DHS OIG Vaughn Index, # 4 Declaration of Okechi Chigewe, # 5 Declaration of Catrina M. Pavlik-Keenan, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Declaration of Fernando Pineiro, # 10 Exhibit 1, # 11 Proposed Judgment for Defendants DHS and DHS OIG) (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/10/2024)
2024-05-0180REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General 66 and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact in Response to Defendants DHS and DHS-OIG's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Plaintiff's Response to Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact ISO Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 05/01/2024)
2024-05-1581REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 79 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 05/15/2024)
2024-05-1582RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 79 (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 05/15/2024)
2024-05-1683Text Only Entry re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 79 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General 66 . Hearings will be conducted by Zoom Webinar. The parties may visit: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-shashi-h-kewalramani to obtain the zoom link webinar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/16/2024)
2024-05-2284MINUTES OF 66 for Summary Judgment related to: Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment 67 , and 79 Motion for Summary Judgment held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The matter was called for Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 67 and 79). Attorneys Laboni Hoq, Eunice Cho, Kyle Virgien, and Michael Kaufman appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Assistant United States Attorney Joseph Tursi and Jason Axe appeared on behalf of Defendants. This matter is fully briefed and the Court heard arguments. The matter will be taken under submission.Time In Court: 1:15 Court Recorder: COURTSMART. <No Attachments> (dc) (Entered: 05/23/2024)
2024-06-0585Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eva Lucia Bitran counsel for Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. Adding Eva Bitran as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attorney Eva Lucia Bitran added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California(pty:pla))(Bitran, Eva) (Entered: 06/05/2024)
2024-06-1286Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Bryan Kaufman counsel for Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. Michael Bryan Kaufman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2024)
2024-07-0887ORDER ON PARTIES' CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: RE 66 and 79 for Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. (dc) (Entered: 07/08/2024)
2024-07-2588EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1) Staying In Part The Court's Order On Parties' Cross Motions For Summary Judgment and (2) Requiring In Camera Review Of 13 Pages Containing Immigration History Redactions filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Redacted Immigration History Documents, # 2 Proposed Order) (Axe, Jason) (Entered: 07/25/2024)
2024-07-2989NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER (DKT. NO. 87) re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 87 (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/29/2024)
2024-07-2990MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1) Staying In Part The Court's Order On Parties' Cross Motions For Summary Judgment and (2) Requiring In Camera Review Of 13 Pages Containing Immigration History Redactions 88 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/29/2024)
2024-07-3191SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1) Staying In Part The Court's Order On Parties' Cross Motions For Summary Judgment and (2) Requiring In Camera Review Of 13 Pages Containing Immigration History Redactions 88 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, 90 Zoom Video Conference set for 8/5/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/31/2024)
2024-08-0292STATUS REPORT Re Court's Order on Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgement (Dkt. 87) filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 08/02/2024)
2024-08-0593MINUTES OF RE 88 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order; Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The Court held a hearing to address Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Order for (1) Staying in Part The Court's Order on Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and (2) Requiring in Camera Review of 13 Pages Containing Immigration History Redactions. Electronic Case Filing Number ("ECF No.") 88. Attorneys Laboni Hoq and Eunice Cho appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Assistant United States Attorney Joseph Tursi and Jason Axe appeared on behalf of Defendants. The Court heard arguments on the record. The parties will brief a Motion for Reconsideration which will be filed by Defendants. The 13-pages at issue will be withheld by Defendants until the motion for reconsideration is complete. The parties are to email their proposed briefing scheduled to the Court. Time: :35 mins. Court Recorder: COURTSMART. <No Attachments> (dc) (Entered: 08/05/2024)
2024-08-0594Text Only Entry re: Briefing Schedule as discussed in Court's Order 93 . The Court accepts and adopts the parties' proposed briefing scheduled for Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration ("Motion".) Defendants are to file its Motion by August 5, 2024 with a hearing date for September 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs Opposition shall be due on or before August 26, 2024, and Defendants' reply shall be due on or before September 3, 2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 8/5/2024 (dc). (Entered: 08/05/2024)
2024-08-0595NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 87 filed by DEFENDANT United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Redacted Immigration History Documents, # 2 Proposed Order) (Axe, Jason) (Entered: 08/06/2024)
2024-08-2696OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 87 95 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 08/26/2024)
2024-09-0397REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 87 95 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG. (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/03/2024)
2024-09-0498TIME CHANGE SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 87 95 previously scheduled for September 11, 2024 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled to 9/11/2024 at 02:00 PM by Zoom Webinar before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/04/2024)
2024-09-1199MINUTES OF 95 MOTION for Reconsideration ; Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The Court held a hearing to address Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration Re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ("Motion"). Electronic Case Filing Numbers ("ECF No.") 95-97. Attorneys Laboni Hoq, Eunice Cho and Kyle Virgien appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Assistant United States Attorney Joseph Tursi and Jason Axe appeared on behalf of Defendants. The Court heard argument from the parties and took the matter under submission. The Court will issue its ruling on a separate cover.Time: :20mins. Court Recorder: COURTSMART. <No PDF Attachments> (dc) (Entered: 09/12/2024)
2024-09-30100MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [ECF No. 95 ] by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: For the reasons set forth below, DHS OIG's Motion is DENIED, without prejudice. (dc) (Entered: 09/30/2024)
2024-10-30101STATUS REPORT and Request for Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 10/30/2024)
2024-11-12102SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re: Status Report 101 . Zoom Video Status Conference set for 11/13/2024 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/12/2024)
2024-11-13103RESPONSE filed by Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIGto Status Report 101 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2024)
2024-11-13104MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing Re Status Report 101 held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The matter came before the Court for a status conference. Attorneys Laboni Hoq, Eunice Cho and Kyle Virgien appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Assistant United States Attorney Joseph Tursi and Jason Axe appeared on behalf of Defendants. Following extensive discussions between the parties, the Court ordered Defendants counsel to confer and identify the personnel with technical knowledge regarding the functionalities of the databases containing the documents that have been identified, for which hit counts have been provided, or that can be uploaded to those databases. This will allow the parties and the Court to determine what modifications can be made to the queries to further narrow the number of documents that must be reviewed and produced in response to the FOIA requests. Defendants are to identify these individuals by November 22, 2024. A further hearing on this matter will be held on December 4, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. via Zoom. Additionally, Defendants' counsel is requested to inquire of these individuals regarding potential modifications to the queries provided by Plaintiff, as well as the time required to obtain results (i.e., hit counts) from the modified queries. CRD: D. CastellanosCourt Recorder: CourtSmart No. 3. <No Attachments> Time: 1:30(dc) (Entered: 11/13/2024)
2024-11-22105STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2024)
2024-12-04106MINUTES OF Continued Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The matter came on today for a continued status conference related to the outstanding production being sought by Plaintiffs. Attorneys Laboni A. How, Eunice H. Cho, and Kyle A. Virgien appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs and Assistant United States Attorneys Jason K. Axe and Joseph W. Tursi appeared on behalf of Defendants. Following discussion and consideration of the status report provided by Defendants, additional information will be obtained from Defendants and shared with Plaintiffs regarding search related questions previously raised by Plaintiffs. Defendants will provide an e-mail update by December 11, 2024 to the Court at the chambers e-mail address and to Plaintiffs. The Court will then determine whether another status hearing will be held. Time: :30 Court Recorder: CourtSmart. <No Attachments> (dc) (Entered: 12/05/2024)
2024-12-16107SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani Status Conference set for 12/19/2024 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani by zoom webinar.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/16/2024)
2024-12-19108MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The Court held a status conference to address the status of the production in the matter responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA requests. Attorneys Laboni Hoq, Eunice Cho, and Kyle Virgien appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Assistant United States Attorneys Joseph Tursi and Jason Axe appeared on behalf of the Defendants.As discussed on the record:1.The Plaintiffs will provide search terms to the Defendants after receiving the CMS documents. The Plaintiffs must also notify the Court once this step is completed.2.Within 30 days, the Defendants are required to obtain an explanation related to the OCIO search, detailing the technical issues affecting the use of search terms, including how these issues impact the ability to obtain hit counts and page numbers of responsive materials.The Court will review the submitted information and schedule a hearing if deemed necessary.Time: : 35 mins CRD: D. CastellanosCourt Recorder: CourtSmart No. 4. <No PDF Attachments> (dc) (Entered: 12/19/2024)
2025-01-21109STATUS REPORT (SECOND) filed by Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, OIG. (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/21/2025)
2025-01-21110STIPULATION for Order SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT U. S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hoq, Laboni) Modified on 1/24/2025 (rec). (Entered: 01/21/2025)
2025-01-24111ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT U. S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting 110 STIPULATION for Order Setting Briefing Schedule. (see document for details) (hr) (Entered: 01/24/2025)
2025-02-26112NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Eunice Cho, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits to Cho Declaration, # 5 Declaration Declaration of Kyle Virgien, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits to Virgien Declaration) (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 02/26/2025)
2025-03-19113NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DEFENDANT UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [Dkt. 112] (mj) filed by Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF FERNANDO PINEIRO, # 2 DEFENDANT U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENTS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS, # 3 DEFENDANT U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS, # 4 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT) (Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/19/2025)
2025-04-09114REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement 112 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact Regarding Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 113], # 2 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement's Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 112])(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 04/09/2025)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar