Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-04 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10046821) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA F-2023-05435, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - FOIA F-2023-05440, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - FOIA F-2023-05441, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney's Office, # 6 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney General, # 7 Summons Summons - State Department)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-04 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-04 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by M. Jared Littman on behalf of All Defendants (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 4 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 5 | ORDER granting Motion 4 for Extension of Time to Respond. Response due by 07/07/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/31/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-05-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/7/2023. (zsmc) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 7 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sam Escher on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney M. Jared Littman (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 8 | ORDER: Local Rule 16.3(b)(10) exempts parties to a FOIA action from typical scheduling order requirements. Instead, the government has the burden to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting dispositive motion. The Court therefore ORDERS the government to file the index and supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/11/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 9 | NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 10 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-08-10 | 11 | Consent MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and File a Joint Status Report Every 60 Days Instead by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 8/15/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 08/10/2023) |
2023-08-14 | 12 | ORDER granting Motion 11 to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and File a Joint Status Report Every 60 Days Instead. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/14/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report by 12/12/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/17/2023) |
2023-12-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2023-12-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report by 2/13/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/13/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 12/13/2023) |
2024-02-12 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
2024-02-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report by 5/14/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/15/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/15/2024) |
2024-05-14 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 05/14/2024) |
2024-05-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report by 7/16/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/14/2024) |
2024-07-16 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 07/16/2024) |
2024-07-30 | 18 | ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit another joint status report, within 10 days of this order, providing additional details about the processing timeline for this Freedom of Information Act request. See order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/30/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/30/2024) |
2024-08-07 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 08/07/2024) |
2024-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 19 of August 7, 2024 and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report no later than October 9, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/17/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 08/17/2024) |
2024-10-07 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 10/07/2024) |
2024-11-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 20 of October 7, 2024, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before December 10, 2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/27/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/27/2024) |
2024-12-10 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/10/2024) |
2024-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 21 of December 10, 2024, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before February 11, 2025. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/17/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 12/17/2024) |
2024-12-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2025. (smc) (Entered: 12/18/2024) |
2025-01-07 | 22 | NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Sweigart on behalf of PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Sweigart, Karin) (Entered: 01/07/2025) |
2025-01-15 | 23 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. Attorney Gary Lawkowski terminated. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 01/15/2025) |
2025-02-10 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 02/10/2025) |
2025-02-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 24 of February 10, 2025, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before April 15, 2025. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/14/2025. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/14/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |