Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10391587) filed by CHARLES GIBBONS, DEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons OUSA, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/02/2023) |
2023-10-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 5, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-11-07 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/07/2023) |
2023-11-09 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/09/2023) |
2023-11-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 15, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 13, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2024-02-15 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/15/2024) |
2024-02-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report by April 15, 2024, and every 60 days thereafter until any party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 20, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 02/20/2024) |
2024-02-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/15/2024. (zcam) (Entered: 02/20/2024) |
2024-04-16 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/16/2024) |
2024-06-20 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/20/2024) |
2024-09-10 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/10/2024) |
2024-09-11 | 11 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Patricia McBride (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 09/11/2024) |
2024-11-12 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/12/2024) |
2024-11-21 | | VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 5/13/2025.....MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their next status report on or before February 10, 2025, and every 90 days thereafter until any party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. If a further adjustment of the status report schedule is warranted, any party may file a motion. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 11/21/24. (lccjn1) Modified to vacated on 5/14/2025. (zalh) (Entered: 11/21/2024) |
2024-11-27 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Amir H. Ali. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/27/2024) |
2025-02-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2025) |
2025-05-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/12/2025) |
2025-05-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 14 joint status report. The Court's November 21, 2024, minute order is vacated. The parties shall file their next joint status report by June 27, 2025. The joint status report shall confirm that production has been completed. Plaintiff shall confirm whether production has been reviewed. To the extent Plaintiff has any issues with production, the parties shall meet and confer to resolve them. To the extent issues remain, the parties shall identify them and include their proposed next steps. Signed by Judge Amir H. Ali on 5/13/2025. (lcaha1) (Entered: 05/13/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |