Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-30 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10454743) filed by ROBERT F KENNEDY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons to DHS, # 10 Summons to USSS, # 11 Summons to USAO, # 12 Summons to USAG)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Brehm on behalf of ROBERT F KENNEDY, JR (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-10-30 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zdp) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 4 | STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 30, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/3/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/3/2023. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 3, 2023. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE served on 11/2/2023 (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/2/2023 (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-12-04 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Scher on behalf of All Defendants (Scher, Allyson) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2023-12-04 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE.(Scher, Allyson) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2023-12-04 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 26, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2023-12-21 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Scher, Allyson) (Entered: 12/21/2023) |
2023-12-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 4, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 21, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/21/2023) |
2023-12-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/4/2024 (zjch, ) (Entered: 12/21/2023) |
2024-03-04 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Scher, Allyson) (Entered: 03/04/2024) |
2024-03-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Status Report, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 4, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 5, 2024. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-06-04 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Scher, Allyson) (Entered: 06/04/2024) |
2024-06-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Status Report, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 2, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 6, 2024. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/06/2024) |
2024-09-03 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Scher, Allyson) (Entered: 09/03/2024) |
2024-09-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Status Report, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 3, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 4, 2024. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/04/2024) |
2024-11-04 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Scher, Allyson) (Entered: 11/04/2024) |
2024-11-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 15 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, the plaintiff's claims against all defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 5, 2024. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/05/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |