Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03268
Date Filed2023-11-01
Date Closed2024-11-21
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionGovernment Accountability & Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the SEC for records concerning email correspondence involving from six agency officials sent to two specific domain addresses over two specified periods of time. GAO also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, GAO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [16]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled that Government Accountability & Oversight failed to show that it was entitled to attorney's fees for FOIA litigation it conducted against the SEC for records concerning the impact of a California climate risk disclosure rule had on the SEC's cost assessment of its own rule. SEC did not receive the original email request because it went into spam as part of the SEC's FOIA email account. Because GAO had not heard from the agency, it filed suit soon after the statutory time limits were exhausted. Once the SEC discovered its error as a result of GAO's litigation, the agency began to process the request and released 363 pages with some portions withheld under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). After reviewing the two pages redacted under the deliberative process privilege the SEC disclosed those redacted portions but continued with its Exemption 6 withholdings. At the end of the litigation, the only issue remaining was whether GAO was eligible for attorney's fees. GAO argued that it was eligible for attorney's fees under the catalyst theory, claiming that the fact that it had filed suit caused the agency to disclose the records. The SEC argued that GAO was not eligible for attorney's fees because it could not show that its suit was the catalyst for disclosing the records because the agency had processed the request in the normal course of business. Contreras agreed with the SEC that the catalyst theory did not apply, noting that "the catalyst theory turns on whether a plaintiff's lawsuit 'substantially caused' the agency to release documents." He indicated that "the mere filing of the complaint and the subsequent release of the document is insufficient to establish causation.'" GAO argued that the SEC disclosed the records only because GAO had diligently pursued its FOIA litigation. But Contreras pointed out that 'there is no reason to think' that the SEC would not have released the documents absent GAO's suit." Contreras rejected GAO's claim that its litigation caused the agency to release the small redactions under Exemption 5. Instead, he found that the redactions would have been revised as part of the appellate review if GAO had followed that route rather than immediately filing suit.
Issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees - Eligibility
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-011COMPLAINT under the Freedom of Information Act against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10464776) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (FOIA Response), # 3 Exhibit C (transmission email), # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons to SEC, # 6 Summons to US Attorney General, # 7 Summons to US Attorney)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2023)
2023-11-022NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zdp) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-144AMENDED COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
2023-12-185ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-18MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit, on or before January 8, 2024, a proposed briefing schedule (not 16.3 report). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/18/2023. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2024-01-086Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/08/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-02-077Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 02/07/2024)
2024-02-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/07/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/07/2024)
2024-03-088Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 03/08/2024)
2024-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 8, 2024, if the matter is not dismissed before that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/08/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/08/2024)
2024-04-089Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 04/08/2024)
2024-04-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/08/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/08/2024)
2024-05-0810Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 05/08/2024)
2024-05-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/09/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/09/2024)
2024-06-0711Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 06/07/2024)
2024-06-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this case: Plaintiff shall file its motion for fees on or before June 21, 2024; the SEC shall file its opposition brief on or before July 19, 2024; and Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before August 9, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/07/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/07/2024)
2024-06-2112MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs pursuant to Minute Order dated 6/7/2024 by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Horner, # 2 Declaration of Matthew Hardin)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2024)
2024-07-1913Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Carrie Hyde-Michaels, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Esther Cheng, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 07/19/2024)
2024-08-0914REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs pursuant to Minute Order dated 6/7/2024 filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Hardin, # 2 Declaration of Christopher C. Horner)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2024)
2024-11-1915ORDER denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/19/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/19/2024)
2024-11-1916MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/19/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/19/2024)
2024-11-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED AS MOOT given the representations set forth in 11 the parties' Joint Status Report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/19/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/19/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar