Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-11-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT Under the Freedom of Information Act against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10516480) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-28 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2023-11-28 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2023-12-01 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/01/2023) |
2023-12-04 | 4 | STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2023. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2023-12-24 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/24/2023) |
2023-12-24 | 6 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/24/2023) |
2023-12-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before January 23, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 26, 2023. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/26/2023) |
2024-01-23 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/23/2024) |
2024-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Meet and Confer report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the Meet and Confer report on or before February 22, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 23, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/23/2024) |
2024-02-22 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/22/2024) |
2024-02-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the defendants are directed to provide the plaintiff on or before March 11, 2024 with (1) a revised estimate of the volume of responsive records broken down by custodian and (2) an estimate of the total page count of responsive records. On or before March 29, 2024, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court on any outstanding issues as to the plaintiff's FOIA requests. The parties shall also propose a schedule for further proceedings. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 23, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 02/23/2024) |
2024-02-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: A revised estimate of the volume of responsive records broken down by custodian and (2) an estimate of the total page count of responsive records due by 3/11/2024. (zjch, ) (Entered: 02/23/2024) |
2024-03-29 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/29/2024) |
2024-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report by May 13, 2024, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for all remaining issues. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 30, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/30/2024) |
2024-05-13 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/13/2024) |
2024-05-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report by June 27, 2024, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for all remaining issues. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 13, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/13/2024) |
2024-06-27 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/27/2024) |
2024-06-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report by August 27, 2024, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for all remaining issues. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 27, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 06/27/2024) |
2024-08-27 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/27/2024) |
2024-08-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before October 28, 2024, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for all remaining issues. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 27, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/27/2024) |
2024-10-28 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/28/2024) |
2024-10-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file on or before December 20, 2024 another joint status report in which the defendant shall explicitly address the objections the plaintiff identified in this 13 report. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 29, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 10/29/2024) |
2024-11-15 | 14 | NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Lindzen on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Lindzen, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/15/2024) |
2024-12-20 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/20/2024) |
2024-12-26 | 16 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. Attorney Nathaniel Lindzen terminated. (Lindzen, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/26/2024) |
2024-12-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 3, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 27, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/27/2024) |
2025-02-03 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2025) |
2025-02-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 3, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 3, 2025. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 02/03/2025) |
2025-04-03 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/03/2025) |
2025-04-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 3, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 4, 2025. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/04/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |