ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
District
District of Columbia
City
Washington, DC
Case Number
1:2023cv03463
Date Filed
2023-11-17
Date Closed
2025-04-02
Judge
Judge Carl J. Nichols
Plaintiff
ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC.
Case Description
Advance Magazine Publishers submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning incidents that took place at various air force bases. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Advance Magazine Publishers filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees
COMPLAINT against U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10503597) filed by ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
2023-11-17
2
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
2023-11-17
3
NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
2023-11-20
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrtw) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
2023-11-20
4
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
2023-11-29
5
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 29, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 11/29/2023)