Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLenahan v. United States Department Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2023cv06041
Date Filed2023-11-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson
PlaintiffHayley Lenahan
Case DescriptionHayley Lenahan submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning a Request for Proposal No. 75A50122-Q-00018 for acquisition of doxycycline hyclate tablets and amoxicillin trihydrate capsules. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Lenahan that the record she requested was maintained by the Department of Labor, not HHS. Lenahan filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lenahan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [38]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-211COMPLAINT (no process) against United States Department Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18859546). Filed by Hayley Lenahan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Takano, Jessica) (Filed on 11/21/2023) Modified on 11/22/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-222Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2023. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
2023-11-223Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
2023-11-274Proposed Summons. (Takano, Jessica) (Filed on 11/27/2023) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
2023-11-28Electronic filing error . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The proposed summons is incomplete. Please complete all portions of the summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: 4 Proposed Summons filed by Hayley Lenahan (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-295Proposed Summons. (Takano, Jessica) (Filed on 11/29/2023) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-306Summons Issued as to United States Department Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2024-01-107ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department Health and Human Services. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 1/10/2024) (Entered: 01/10/2024)
2024-01-108CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department Health and Human Services.. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 1/10/2024) (Entered: 01/10/2024)
2024-01-109CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Hayley Lenahan shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/24/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2024) (Entered: 01/10/2024)
2024-01-1010CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hayley Lenahan.. (Takano, Jessica) (Filed on 1/10/2024) (Entered: 01/10/2024)
2024-01-3111STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exempt Parties from Rule 26 Requirements filed by United States Department Health and Human Services, Haley Lenahan (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 1/31/2024) Modified on 2/1/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/31/2024)
2024-01-3112ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 11 Stipulation to exempt parties from Rule 26 requirements. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2024) (Entered: 01/31/2024)
2024-02-0213ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2024) (Entered: 02/02/2024)
2024-02-0714ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 2/7/2024) (Entered: 02/07/2024)
2024-02-0715ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Takano, Jessica) (Filed on 2/7/2024) (Entered: 02/07/2024)
2024-02-1516Certificate of Interested Entities by Hayley Lenahan (Takano, Jessica) (Filed on 2/15/2024) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
2024-02-1517JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department Health and Human Services, Hayley Lenahan. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 2/15/2024) Modified on 2/16/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2024)
2024-02-1518ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson re 17 Joint Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference is continued to 4/25/2024 at 10:00 A.M. The parties shall file an updated case management statement by 4/18/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
2024-04-1819STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department Health and Human Services, Hayley Lenahan. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 4/18/2024) Modified on 4/19/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/18/2024)
2024-04-2020ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 19 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Managemen Conference: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2024) (Entered: 04/20/2024)
2024-05-2121STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department Health and Human Services. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 5/21/2024) (Entered: 05/21/2024)
2024-05-2822ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 21 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2024 10:00 AM. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024) (Entered: 05/28/2024)
2024-07-2523STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department Health and Human Services. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/25/2024) Modified on 7/25/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2024)
2024-07-2824ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 23 Stipulation : Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2024) (Entered: 07/28/2024)
2024-09-2625STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department Health and Human Services. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/26/2024) (Entered: 09/26/2024)
2024-09-2626ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S.Hixson granting 25 Stipulation to continue initial case management conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2024. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2024) (Entered: 09/26/2024)
2024-10-3127STATUS REPORT and REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hayley Lenahan. (Lenahan, Hayley) (Filed on 10/31/2024) (Entered: 10/31/2024)
2024-11-0128ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2025 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/1/2024. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2024) (Entered: 11/01/2024)
2024-11-2729NOTICE by Hayley Lenahan of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hayley M. Lenahan, # 2 Exhibit 1 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 12 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 14 Proposed Order)(Lenahan, Hayley) (Filed on 11/27/2024) (Entered: 11/27/2024)
2024-11-29Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. The correct event is a motion. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: 29 Notice filed by Hayley Lenahan. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2024) (Entered: 11/29/2024)
2024-11-2930Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Hayley Lenahan. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 1/30/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 12/13/2024. Replies due by 12/20/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hayley M. Lenahan, # 2 Exhibit 1 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 12 of Lenahan's Declaration, # 14 Proposed Order)(Lenahan, Hayley) (Filed on 11/29/2024) Modified on 12/2/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2024)
2024-12-0931STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by United States Department Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sapna Mehta)(Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 12/9/2024) Modified on 12/10/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/09/2024)
2024-12-0932ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 31 Stipulation re Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2024) (Entered: 12/09/2024)
2024-12-09Set/Reset Deadlines as to 30 Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/27/2024. Replies due by 1/17/2025. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2024) (Entered: 12/09/2024)
2024-12-09Set Deadlines/Hearings: (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2024) (Entered: 12/09/2024)
2024-12-2733Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department Health and Human Services. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 2/20/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 1/17/2025. Replies due by 1/31/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alesia Williams, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration of Sapna Mehta, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Declaration of Pamela Johann, # 7 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 12/27/2024) Modified on 12/30/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/27/2024)
2025-01-1734REPLY (re 33 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Hayley Lenahan. (Lenahan, Hayley) (Filed on 1/17/2025) Modified on 1/21/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2025)
2025-01-3135REPLY (re 33 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by United States Department Health and Human Services. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 1/31/2025) Modified on 2/3/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/31/2025)
2025-02-1936ORDER VACATING HEARING. This matter is currently scheduled for a hearing on February 20, 2025 regarding the parties' motions for summary judgment. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and VACATES the hearing. The matter is deemed under submission. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/19/2025. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2025) (Entered: 02/19/2025)
2025-03-0437ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: The March 13, 2025 case management conference and related deadlines are hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2025) (Entered: 03/04/2025)
2025-04-2138ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 33 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2025) (Entered: 04/21/2025)
2025-04-2139CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2025. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2025 10:00 AM. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2025) (Entered: 04/21/2025)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar