Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKHATCHADOURIAN v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03520
Date Filed2023-11-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffRAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN
Case DescriptionRaffi Khatchadourian, a writer for the New Yorker, submitted two FOIA requests to the CIA for records. The first request asked for records concerning the International Whaling Commission's activities between 1977 and 1982. The second request asked for records concerning James Ralph Rose, a deceased military veteran. The agency acknowledged the receipt of both requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Khatchadourian filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-241COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10515776) filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/28/2023) (zdp). (Entered: 11/24/2023)
2023-11-28Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zdp) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-282SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-293STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 29, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-12-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/11/2023 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/27/2023) (mg). (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/22/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/30/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/30/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/27/2023) (mg). (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-287Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2023-12-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before January 24, 2024. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 30, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/30/2023)
2024-01-248ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/24/2024)
2024-02-049ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Certification by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Gutman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/8/2024; refild as docket entry 10 (zdp). (Entered: 02/04/2024)
2024-02-0610MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Certification by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
2024-02-0611ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 6, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
2024-02-2212Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit, # 2 Plaintiff's Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Defendant's Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 02/22/2024)
2024-03-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before April 9, 2024, including a proposal for future proceedings. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 5, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/05/2024)
2024-04-0313Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 04/03/2024)
2024-04-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 13 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file their joint status report on or before April 17, 2024. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 4, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 04/04/2024)
2024-04-1714Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Proposed Order, # 2 Defendant's Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 04/17/2024)
2024-04-1815MOTION for Hearing by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) Modified event type and docket text on 4/19/2024 (zdp). (Entered: 04/18/2024)
2024-04-25Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/1/2024 at 02:30 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcam) (Entered: 04/25/2024)
2024-05-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Status Conference held on 5/1/2024. Meet & Confer by 5/24/2024. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. (zcam) (Entered: 05/01/2024)
2024-05-2416Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 05/24/2024)
2024-06-26NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17- In Person before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcam) (Entered: 06/26/2024)
2024-07-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Status Conference held on 7/30/2024. Status Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Carl J. Nichols. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. (zcam) (Entered: 07/30/2024)
2024-08-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/8/2024. Meet & Confer by 9/13/2024. Defense Summary Judgment motion due by 9/27/2024. Further Order to be issued by the Court. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. (zcam) Modified on 8/8/2024 (zcam). (Entered: 08/08/2024)
2024-09-0917NOTICE and Request for Student Appearance by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/09/2024)
2024-09-1918STUDENT APPEARANCE APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 17, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 09/19/2024)
2024-09-2719MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Mary C. Williams (with Exhibits A-G), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Aug. 8, 2024 Tr.), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 09/27/2024)
2024-09-3020MOTION for Leave to Appear Student Attorney Ann Silva by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2024)
2024-10-0221TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Carl J. Nichols, on July 30, 2024. Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: October 2, 2024. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. Email: Lorraine_Herman@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/23/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2024.(Herman, Lorraine) (Entered: 10/02/2024)
2024-10-0222TRANSCRIPT OF VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 1, 2024. Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance: October 2, 2024. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. Email: Lorraine_Herman@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/23/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2024.(Herman, Lorraine) (Entered: 10/02/2024)
2024-10-0223TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 8, 2024. Page Numbers: 1-22. Date of Issuance: October 2, 2024. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. Email: Lorraine_Herman@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/23/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2024.(Herman, Lorraine) (Entered: 10/02/2024)
2024-10-0724ORDER APPROVING STUDENT APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 7, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/07/2024)
2024-10-0725Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit B of Docket Entry 19-3 (pages 23-30) and Replace with Redacted Document (Ex. 1, Attached) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Document, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/07/2024)
2024-10-15ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 25 Unopposed Motion to Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove pages 23 through 30 of [19-3] and replace them with [25-1]. SO ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 10/15/24. (lccjn1) Modified on 10/15/2024 (zcam). (Entered: 10/15/2024)
2024-10-15NOTICE OF ERROR: Minute Order filed 10/15/2024 will be refiled with correct terminology. (zcam) (Entered: 10/15/2024)
2024-12-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 25 Motion to Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal [19-3] and file [25-1] as a standalone exhibit. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 12/13/24. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/13/2024)
2024-12-1326NOTICE of Redacted Exhibit 1 re 25 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (zdp) (Entered: 12/17/2024)
2024-12-2327Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File opposition to motion for summary judgment and cross-motion by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) Modified filer on 3/3/2025 (znmw). (Entered: 12/23/2024)
2025-01-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 27 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Plaintiff's [27-2] combined opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment is deemed FILED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before February 28, 2025; and that Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 17, 2025. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 1/8/25. (lccjn1) (Entered: 01/08/2025)
2025-01-0831Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw) (Entered: 03/03/2025)
2025-01-0832Memorandum in opposition to re 19 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (See Docket Entry 31 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/03/2025)
2025-01-1728ERRATA by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN re 27 Motion for Leave to File,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/17/2025)
2025-02-0529NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Alberto Andino, III on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Andino, Carlos) (Entered: 02/05/2025)
2025-02-2830Memorandum in opposition to re 31 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, Combined Reply in Further Support of Def. Motion for Summary Judgement and Memorandum in Opposition to Pl. Cross Motion for Summary Judgement filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts COMBINED REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND RESPONSE TO PLAINT, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Andino, Carlos) Modified link on 3/3/2025 (znmw). (Entered: 02/28/2025)
2025-02-2833REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (See Docket Entry 30 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/03/2025)
2025-03-0934Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/09/2025)
2025-03-10MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 34 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and that Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before March 31, 2025. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 3/10/25. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/10/2025)
2025-03-2835NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Carlos Andino (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/28/2025)
2025-03-3136REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/31/2025)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar