Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKHATCHADOURIAN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03670
Date Filed2023-12-08
Date Closed2024-12-09
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffRAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN
Case DescriptionNew Yorker reporter Raffi Khatchadourian submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning its investigation of Greenpeace that took place in the 1970s. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Khatchadourian that it had inadvertently listed his time frame from 1967 to 1976 rather than 1976 to 1977. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Khatchadourian filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10547219) filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/11/2023) (zcb). (Entered: 12/08/2023)
2023-12-11Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-112SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-183STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 12/18/2023. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2024-01-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/20/2023 (Gutman, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 1/12/2024 (mg). (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 12/19/2023 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/19/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2024. (Gutman, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 1/12/2024 (mg). (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-128ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-02-049MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Certification by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/04/2024)
2024-02-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 9 Motion for Leave to Appear as Law Student, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Ms. Stephanie Camhi may participate in the above-captioned case under the supervision of counsel for Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 2/8/2024. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/08/2024)
2024-02-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/12/2024)
2024-02-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of First Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file another joint status report on March 13, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Carl J. Nichols. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/20/2024)
2024-03-1311Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2024)
2024-04-1212STATUS REPORT with proposed orders by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2024)
2024-07-2713MOTION for Extension of Time to File with proposed order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2024)
2024-08-3014MOTION for Summary Judgment with proposed order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration with Exhibits A-F)(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 08/30/2024)
2024-09-0615NOTICE of Appearance by Anne L. Weismann on behalf of RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/06/2024)
2024-09-0916Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment with proposed order by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/09/2024)
2024-09-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, on or before October 11, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 09/13/2024. (lccjn3) (Entered on 09/13/2024) (Entered: 09/13/2024)
2024-09-2717MOTION for Leave to Appear Student Attorney Cameron Johnson by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2024)
2024-09-2718MOTION for Leave to Appear Student Attorney Melissa Rettig by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2024)
2024-09-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Student Attorney Cameron Johnson and 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Student Attorney Melissa Rettig, it is hereby ORDERED that both motions are GRANTED. So ordered by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 09/30/2024 (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/30/2024) (Entered: 09/30/2024)
2024-10-1119Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/11/2024)
2024-10-1120Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/11/2024)
2024-10-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants' 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is ORDERED that the motion Is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Defendants' 14 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be deemed timely filed. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 10/18/2024 (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/18/2024) (Entered: 10/18/2024)
2024-10-1821MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with proposed order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2024)
2024-10-2022Memorandum in opposition to re 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/20/2024)
2024-10-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED IN PART. Defendants shall file their combined response to Plaintiffs 20 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and reply in support of their 14 Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 11/15/2024. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 10/21/2024. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/21/2024) (Entered: 10/21/2024)
2024-11-0423SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/04/2024)
2024-11-0424SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/04/2024)
2024-11-1525Memorandum in opposition to re 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration)(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/15/2024)
2024-11-1526REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration)(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/15/2024)
2024-11-2127STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/21/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar