Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03636
Date Filed2023-12-04
Date Closed2025-04-16
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffDARNELL W. MOON
Case DescriptionDarrell Moon submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Justice for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Moon filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
TERMINATED: 01/13/2025
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE FOIA/PA Office
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-12-04Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/04/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsl) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by DARNELL W. MOON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(zsl) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-042MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DARNELL W. MOON. (zsl) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this case directly to Judge Royce Lamberth as related to Civil Action No. 23-3641 (RCL). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/19/23. (psu2) (Entered: 12/19/2023)
2023-12-20Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsl) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
2023-12-313AMENDED COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL with Jury Demand filed by DARNELL W. MOON.(znmw) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-124NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by DARNELL W. MOON (znmw) (Entered: 01/16/2024)
2024-02-265NOTICE to Court and Request for Documents by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 02/29/2024)
2024-02-266NOTICE to the Court and Request for Issuance of a Summons by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 02/29/2024)
2024-02-267NOTICE of Change of Address by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 02/29/2024)
2024-02-268NOTICE of Change of Financial Circumstances by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 02/29/2024)
2024-03-019SUMMONS (5) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; sent to U.S. Marshals Service. (znmw) (Entered: 03/01/2024)
2024-03-0710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 3/7/2024 (zdp) (Entered: 03/08/2024)
2024-03-0811RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS served on 3/7/2024; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 3/7/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/07/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2024.) (zdp) (Entered: 03/08/2024)
2024-03-1412RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/14/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/13/2024. (zdp) (Entered: 03/15/2024)
2024-03-1413NOTICE of Change of Address by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 03/15/2024)
2024-03-2914NOTICE to the Court by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 04/02/2024)
2024-04-0415NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/04/2024)
2024-04-1216MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/12/2024)
2024-04-1217ORDER granting Motion 16 for Extension of Time to Respond. Response to plaintiff's amended complaint due by 5/16/2024. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/12/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/12/2024)
2024-04-1218NOTICE of Change of Address by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 04/17/2024)
2024-05-1519MOTION to Vacate THE COURT'S DECEMBER 19, 2023, MINUTE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS , MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/15/2024)
2024-05-3120CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL re 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint . (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/31/2024)
2024-06-0321RESPONSE re 19 MOTION to Vacate THE COURT'S DECEMBER 19, 2023, MINUTE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS filed by DARNELL W. MOON. (zdp) (Entered: 06/06/2024)
2024-06-0322MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Sanctions by DARNELL W. MOON. (zdp) (Entered: 06/06/2024)
2024-06-0623ORDER denying Motion 19 to Vacate and Stay: For the reasons stated in the Order, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motion is DENIED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 3 by 06/17/2024. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/06/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/06/2024)
2024-06-1324ORDER denying Motion 22 for Hearing; denying Motion 22 for Sanctions: For the reasons stated in the Order, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is DENIED and plaintiff's Motion for Hearing is DENIED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/13/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/13/2024)
2024-06-1725ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/17/2024)
2024-06-1826NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William J. Harrington on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE Substituting for attorney Stephanie R. Johnson (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/18/2024)
2024-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Currently before the Court in this FOIA case is the 3 Amended Complaint, filed by an incarcerated Plaintiff, and Defendants' 25 Answer. The requirements of D.C. LCvR 16.3 and Federal Civil Rule 26(f) are therefore inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that, by July 16, 2024, Defendants shall file a Status Report that includes: the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and any other pertinent issues. If appropriate, the Status Report shall also include a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his current address of record. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/02/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/02/2024)
2024-07-0327DEACTIVATE Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 07/11/2024)
2024-07-12MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a 27 Notice, requesting that the Clerk of Court "deactivate" his pro se 4 Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Court notes, however, that although Plaintiff previously consented to electronic noticing, he never moved for CM/ECF access, see D.C. LCvR 5.4(b)(2); therefore, he has not been permitted to file or receive service electronically. To the extent that, due to the circumstances of his current incarceration, he may not have yet received copies of certain orders, the Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to mail to Plaintiff, at his current address of record, a copy of this Minute Order, an updated docket sheet, and additional courtesy copies of: the Court's Order (dated 4/12/24), ECF No. 17; the Court's Order (dated 6/6/24), ECF No. 23; the Court's Order (dated 6/13/24), ECF No. 24; and, the Court's Minute Order (dated 7/2/24). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/12/2024. (psu3) (Entered: 07/12/2024)
2024-07-1628Joint STATUS REPORT by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/16/2024)
2024-07-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendants' most recent 28 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that OIG and EOUSA shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment by October 15, 2024; Plaintiff shall file his Opposition and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on November 22, 2024; OIG and EOUSA shall file their Reply and any Opposition by December 23, 2024; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply, if necessary, by January 23, 2025. It is further ORDERED that Defendant IRS shall file a renewed Status Report by August 30, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/22/2024. (psu3) (Entered: 07/22/2024)
2024-08-2329Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Minute Order entered on 7/22/2024 Sent to Darnell W. Moon; Resent to New Address: Unknown. (smc) (Entered: 08/23/2024)
2024-08-3030STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrington, William) (Entered: 08/30/2024)
2024-09-23MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Defendant IRS's most recent 30 Status Report, it is still in the process of reviewing 4,600 or more pages in response to Plaintiff's FOIA requests. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant IRS shall file a renewed Status Report by December 2, 2024, addressing in detail the status of those FOIA requests, and any other pertinent updates. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/23/2024. (psu3) (Entered: 09/23/2024)
2024-09-2331NOTICE to the Court Regarding Status Report by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 09/26/2024)
2024-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/2/2024. (smc) (Entered: 09/24/2024)
2024-09-2732STATUS REPORT in Resp. to ECF 31 by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Aug. 30, 2024 Ltr. to Mr. Moon)(Harrington, William) (Entered: 09/27/2024)
2024-10-1533MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Waller, # 3 Declaration of Finney, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/15/2024)
2024-10-1734ORDER directing Plaintiff to, in accordance with the Court's existing briefing schedule, file an Opposition to the Inspector General and EOUSA's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment by November 22, 2024, or risk the Court ruling on it without the benefit of his position. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/2024. (psu3) (Entered: 10/17/2024)
2024-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 11/22/2024. (smc) (Entered: 10/18/2024)
2024-12-0235STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 12/02/2024)
2024-12-0236NOTICE of Change of Address by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 12/03/2024)
2024-12-0237MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DARNELL W. MOON. (zdp) (Entered: 12/03/2024)
2024-12-0238NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by DARNELL W. MOON (zdp) (Entered: 12/03/2024)
2024-12-06MINUTE ORDER: First, upon review of the IRS's most recent 35 Status Report, and given its ongoing processing of Plaintiff's FOIA Requests, it shall file its next Status Report by March 3, 2025. Second, Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Extend the Briefing Schedule Nunc Pro Tunc is hereby GRANTED for good cause shown. Plaintiff shall now, by December 23, 2024, file his Opposition to OIG/EOUSA's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; OIG and EOUSA shall, by January 23, 2025, file their Reply and any Opposition; and Plaintiff shall, by February 22, 2025, file his Reply, if necessary. The Court notes that Plaintiff's 37 Motion failed to include a certificate of service, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(a)(1), and there is no indication that Plaintiff attempted to comply with D.C. LCvR 7(m). Plaintiff is once again reminded that, although he is proceeding pro se, he is obligated to comply with all applicable Federal and Local Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/6/2024. (psu3) (Entered: 12/06/2024)
2024-12-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Response/Cross Motions due by 12/23/2024. Reply/Response to Cross Motions due by 1/23/2025. Reply to Cross Motions due by 2/22/2025. Status Report due by 3/3/2025. (smc) (Entered: 12/09/2024)
2024-12-2339MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DARNELL W. MOON. (zdp) (Entered: 12/23/2024)
2024-12-2840RESPONSE re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DARNELL W. MOON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(mg) (Entered: 01/07/2025)
2025-01-02MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Extend Deadlines to file his Opposition to OIG/EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment and his Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED nunc pro tunc, in light of Defendants' consent and for good cause shown. Plaintiff shall now file his Opposition and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than January 6, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/2/2025. (psu3) Modified to correct year of deadline on 1/3/2025 (smc). (Entered: 01/02/2025)
2025-01-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/6/2025. (smc) (Entered: 01/03/2025)
2025-01-1241STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/12/2025)
2025-01-1542Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2025)
2025-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Defendant EOUSA's 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Reply to Plaintiff's 40 Opposition to Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED, in light of Plaintiff's consent and for good cause shown. EOUSA shall now file its Reply by no later than February 13, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/17/2025. (psu3) (Entered: 01/17/2025)
2025-01-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 2/13/2025. (smc) (Entered: 01/21/2025)
2025-02-1343REPLY to opposition to motion re 33 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Auborn Finney)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/13/2025)
2025-02-2844STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 02/28/2025)
2025-03-03NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re 44 STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Harrington, William). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 3/10/2025. (zapb) (Entered: 03/03/2025)
2025-03-0345STATUS REPORT of the Internal Revenue Service by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Banerjee, Carmen) (Entered: 03/03/2025)
2025-03-26MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of Defendant IRS's 45 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant IRS shall file its next Status Report by June 3, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/26/2025. (psu3) (Entered: 03/26/2025)
2025-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/3/2025. (smc) (Entered: 03/26/2025)
2025-04-1346NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DARNELL W. MOON. (zdp) (Entered: 04/14/2025)
2025-04-1547STIPULATION of Dismissal by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 04/15/2025)
2025-04-16MINUTE ORDER: Given the Parties' 47 Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court thus DISMISSES this matter without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/16/2025. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/16/2025)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar