Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2024-02-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10708786) filed by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons for the U.S. Department of the Interior, # 4 Summons for the National Park Service, # 5 Summons for the Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 02/23/2024) |
2024-02-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zed) (Entered: 02/26/2024) |
2024-02-26 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/26/2024) |
2024-03-05 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 5, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-19 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/26/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/18/2024. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 03/19/2024) |
2024-03-27 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christina O'Tousa on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 03/27/2024) |
2024-03-27 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 03/27/2024) |
2024-04-26 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 04/26/2024) |
2024-04-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before June 24, 2024, and every 60 days thereafter until any party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 30, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 04/30/2024) |
2024-06-21 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 06/21/2024) |
2024-06-24 | 9 | STATUS REPORT by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 06/24/2024) |
2024-06-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 8 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file their next status report on or before July 8, 2024. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 25, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 06/25/2024) |
2024-07-08 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Schreiber on behalf of All Defendants (Schreiber, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2024) |
2024-07-08 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Schreiber, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2024) |
2024-08-29 | 12 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Attorney Peter C. Pfaffenroth and Alexander Schreiber terminated. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 08/29/2024) |
2024-09-06 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 09/06/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |