Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2024-03-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10773481) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Attorney General, # 2 Summons to US Attorney, # 3 Summons to SEC, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2024) |
2024-03-22 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2024) |
2024-03-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmw) (Entered: 03/22/2024) |
2024-03-22 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Counsel/Party)(znmw) (Entered: 03/22/2024) |
2024-03-22 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2024. (lcrdm1) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/21/2024) (zglw). (Entered: 03/22/2024) |
2024-04-22 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Bailey on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Bailey, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2024) |
2024-04-22 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Bailey, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2024) |
2024-04-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 16, 2024, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on May 23, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/23/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/23/2024) |
2024-05-16 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Bailey, Michael) (Entered: 05/16/2024) |
2024-05-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial scheduling conference scheduled for May 23, 2024 is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before July 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/17/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/17/2024) |
2024-07-01 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Bailey, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2024) |
2024-07-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before August 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/2/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/02/2024) |
2024-08-01 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Bailey, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2024) |
2024-08-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before September 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/4/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/04/2024) |
2024-08-30 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Bailey, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2024) |
2024-08-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before October 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/30/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/30/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |