Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2010-10-05 | 1 | COMPLAINT (summons issued) against U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611051375.). Filed byJohn M. Kelly. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/07/2010) |
2010-10-05 | | CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010) |
2010-10-05 | 2 | ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010) |
2010-10-05 | 3 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Commerce. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010) |
2010-10-05 | 4 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Census Bureau. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010) |
2010-10-06 | 5 | Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by John M. Kelly. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010) |
2010-10-08 | 6 | CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010) (Entered: 10/12/2010) |
2010-10-08 | 7 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO PLAINTIFF re 6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010) (Entered: 10/12/2010) |
2010-10-13 | 8 | ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on October 13, 2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010) (Entered: 10/13/2010) |
2010-10-15 | 9 | INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010) (Entered: 10/15/2010) |
2010-10-18 | 10 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John M. Kelly re 1 Complaint, 4 Summons Issued, 3 Summons Issued (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010) (Entered: 10/20/2010) |
2010-10-18 | 11 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John M. Kelly re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010) (Entered: 10/20/2010) |
2010-11-08 | 12 | Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 11/8/2010) (Entered: 11/08/2010) |
2010-11-12 | 13 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judge's civil standing orders by John M. Kelly. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010) (Entered: 11/17/2010) |
2010-11-12 | 14 | Certificate of Interested Entities by John M. Kelly. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010) (Entered: 11/17/2010) |
2010-11-24 | 15 | AMENDED COMPLAINT by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 12/14/2010 (rcs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/30/2010) |
2010-12-10 | 16 | Answer to Amended Complaint 15 Amended Complaint, for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 12/10/2010) Modified on 12/14/2010 (rcs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/10/2010) |
2010-12-22 | 17 | NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010) |
2010-12-22 | 18 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010) |
2010-12-29 | 21 | MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010) (Entered: 01/03/2011) |
2010-12-29 | 22 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 21 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010) (Entered: 01/03/2011) |
2010-12-29 | 23 | Proposed Order re 22 Declaration in Support, 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010) (Entered: 01/03/2011) |
2010-12-30 | 19 | ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 1/13/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 908827. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010) (Entered: 12/30/2010) |
2010-12-30 | 24 | NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by John M. Kelly (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010) (Entered: 01/04/2011) |
2010-12-30 | 25 | MOTION for Leave to File a Summary Judgment Motion Exceeding the Page Limit filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010) (Entered: 01/04/2011) |
2010-12-30 | 26 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 25 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010) (Entered: 01/04/2011) |
2010-12-30 | 27 | Received Document (Proposed) Order re 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010) (Entered: 01/04/2011) |
2011-01-03 | 20 | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011) (Entered: 01/03/2011) |
2011-01-07 | 28 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 1/7/2011) (Entered: 01/07/2011) |
2011-01-07 | 29 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John M. Kelly. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011) (Entered: 01/11/2011) |
2011-01-07 | 30 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 29 Case Management Statement filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 29 ) (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011) (Entered: 01/11/2011) |
2011-01-10 | 31 | ERRATA re 29 Case Management Statement by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (Entered: 01/12/2011) |
2011-01-13 | | ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 1/13/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011) (Entered: 01/13/2011) |
2011-01-13 | 32 | NOTICE of Change of Address by John M. Kelly-updated address. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011) (Entered: 01/18/2011) |
2011-01-18 | 33 | Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/14/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 1/18/2011). Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 6/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2011) (Entered: 01/18/2011) |
2011-01-24 | 34 | "MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses" filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011) (Entered: 01/25/2011) |
2011-01-24 | 35 | Proposed Order re 34 MOTION to Strike by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011) (Entered: 01/25/2011) |
2011-01-27 | 36 | Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/14/11, before Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2011. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011) (Entered: 01/27/2011) |
2011-01-28 | 37 | MOTION for Order Requiring Defendants to Preserve and Protect Relevant Evidence in this Case filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011) (Entered: 02/01/2011) |
2011-01-28 | 38 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 37 MOTION filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 37 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011) (Entered: 02/01/2011) |
2011-01-28 | 39 | Proposed Order re 37 MOTION by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011) (Entered: 02/01/2011) |
2011-02-02 | 41 | MOTION for Correct Transcript for Case Management Conference; Proposed Order filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011) |
2011-02-04 | 40 | ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Fred D. Butler as Mediator. (pirness, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011) |
2011-02-08 | 42 | Memorandum in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Strike filed byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011) |
2011-02-09 | 43 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re 42 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 2/9/2011) (Entered: 02/09/2011) |
2011-02-15 | 44 | REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION (re 34 MOTION to Strike ) filed byJohn M. Kelly. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011) (Entered: 02/17/2011) |
2011-02-24 | 45 | OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST CONCERNING DEFENDANTS' VAUGHN INDEX by John M. Kelly. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011) (Entered: 03/01/2011) |
2011-02-24 | 46 | Declaration of JOHN M. KELLY in Support of 45 Objection filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 45 ) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011) (Entered: 03/01/2011) |
2011-02-25 | | Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 3/3/2011 at 11:00 a.m. (PT) (pirness, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011) (Entered: 02/25/2011) |
2011-02-25 | 47 | NOTICE OF ERRATA by John M. Kelly re 45 Objection (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011) (Entered: 03/01/2011) |
2011-02-25 | 48 | Proposed Order Re Defendants' Vaughn Index by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011) |
2011-03-03 | 49 | Letter from John M. Kelly dated 2/8/2011 re Complaint re Court Clerk's Authority to Change Stats of Filed Documents. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011) |
2011-03-03 | 50 | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF re 49 Letter filed by John M. Kelly. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/3/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011) |
2011-03-14 | 52 | MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) (Entered: 03/17/2011) |
2011-03-14 | 53 | Proposed Order re 52 MOTION for Leave to File by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) (Entered: 03/17/2011) |
2011-03-17 | 51 | ORDER VACATING MARCH 3, 2011 50 ORDER AS UNNECESSARY. It appears to the Court that the Clerk took corrective actions as outlined to Plaintiff in a letter dated January 20, 2011. This corrective action eliminated the need for the Chief Judge to grant any administrative relief based on the February 8, 2011 letter. Therefore, after reconsideration and with the above clarification of the Court's procedures, the March 3 Order is vacated as unnecessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011) (Entered: 03/17/2011) |
2011-03-25 | 57 | "NOTICE Regarding Submitted Matters" by John M. Kelly (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011) |
2011-03-29 | 54 | ADR Clerks Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator, Fred D. Butler 40 . The ADR Program will appoint another mediator as soon as possible. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011) |
2011-03-29 | 55 | ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, April 5, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. pacific time. Please use call-in number 712-775-7400 and access code 1043914 to be connected to the conference call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011) |
2011-03-29 | 56 | MOTION for Leave to File ; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO VAUGHN INDEX AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Attachment C, Part 1, # 4 Attachment C, Part 2, # 5 Attachment C, Part 3)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011) |
2011-03-30 | 58 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re 56 MOTION for Leave to File ; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO VAUGHN INDEX AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MOTION for Leave to File ; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO VAUGHN INDEX AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 3/30/2011) (Entered: 03/30/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 60 | ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 56 Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: # 1 cos) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/05/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 62 | MOTION to Strike 56 filed by John M. Kelly. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 63 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 62 MOTION to Strike filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 62 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 64 | Opposition 56 to Administrative Motion for Authority to File Reply by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 65 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 64 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 64 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 66 | Proposed Order DENYING Motion for Authority to File Reply by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 67 | Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-05 | 59 | ORDER RE OUTSTANDING MOTIONS by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 34 Motion to Strike ; denying 37 Motion ; denying 41 Motion (Attachments: # 1 cos) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011) (Entered: 04/05/2011) |
2011-04-05 | | ***Deadlines terminated. 59 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011) (Entered: 04/05/2011) |
2011-04-05 | | ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 4/5/2011 with Howard A. Herman, ADR Program Director. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-06 | 61 | ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/6/11. (Attachments: # 1 COS)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-06 | | CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011) |
2011-04-07 | 72 | CLERKS NOTICE : Settlement Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011) |
2011-04-26 | 68 | MOTION for Leave of Court to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011) (Entered: 04/28/2011) |
2011-04-26 | 69 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 68 MOTION filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 68 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011) (Entered: 04/28/2011) |
2011-04-26 | 70 | Proposed Order re 68 MOTION by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011) (Entered: 04/28/2011) |
2011-05-02 | 71 | ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE re: Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Strike (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) (Entered: 05/02/2011) |
2011-05-13 | 73 | MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/16/2011) |
2011-05-13 | 74 | Proposed Order re 73 MOTION for Leave to File by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/16/2011) |
2011-05-16 | 76 | Proposed Order 73 by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011) (Entered: 05/17/2011) |
2011-05-17 | 75 | ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE denying 73 Third Motion for Reconsideration (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011) (Entered: 05/17/2011) |
2011-05-18 | 77 | Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/18/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2011: # 1 proof of service) (cgk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2011) |
2011-05-20 | 79 | MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Submit Submissions Re Settlement Conference Order; Declaration of John M. Kelly filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011) (Entered: 05/24/2011) |
2011-05-20 | 80 | Proposed Order 79 by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011) (Entered: 05/24/2011) |
2011-05-23 | 78 | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SUBMIT SUBMISSIONS RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. The Parties' confidential settlement conference statements shall be hand-delivered on or before 5/25/2011. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011) (Entered: 05/23/2011) |
2011-05-24 | 81 | ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011) (Entered: 05/24/2011) |
2011-06-22 | 82 | STATUS REPORT Of Federal Defendants by U.S. Census Bureau. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011) |
2011-06-22 | 83 | Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Judge Laporte on 6/2/2011. Case did not settle. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011) |
2011-06-22 | 84 | MOTION for Recusal filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2012: # 1 cross-motion) (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2011) |
2011-06-22 | 85 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 84 MOTION for Recusal filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 84 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011) |
2011-06-22 | 86 | Proposed Order re 84 MOTION for Recusal by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011) |
2011-06-23 | 87 | ERRATA re 84 MOTION for Recusal by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011) |
2011-06-24 | 88 | Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/24/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 6/24/2011). Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 9/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011) |
2011-06-24 | | ***Deadlines terminated. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011) |
2011-07-22 | 89 | MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for , MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/5/2011. Replies due by 8/12/2011. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Entered: 07/22/2011) |
2011-07-22 | 90 | Declaration of Mary C. Potter in Support of 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 89 ) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Entered: 07/22/2011) |
2011-07-22 | 91 | Declaration of LOUIS AVENILLA in Support of 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Related document(s) 89 ) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Entered: 07/22/2011) |
2011-07-22 | 92 | Declaration of MICHAEL BURNS in Support of 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Related document(s) 89 ) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Entered: 07/22/2011) |
2011-07-22 | 93 | Declaration of BRYN JOHNSON in Support of 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Related document(s) 89 ) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Entered: 07/22/2011) |
2011-07-25 | 94 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re 91 Declaration in Support, 92 Declaration in Support, 90 Declaration in Support, 93 Declaration in Support, 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for MOTION for Summary Judgment (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (Entered: 07/25/2011) |
2011-08-04 | 95 | Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by John M. Kelly. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011) (Entered: 08/08/2011) |
2011-08-04 | 96 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgement filed byJohn M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2011: # 1 part 2) (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/08/2011) |
2011-08-08 | 98 | RESPONSE (re 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJohn M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011) (Entered: 08/10/2011) |
2011-08-08 | 99 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 98 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 98 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011) (Entered: 08/10/2011) |
2011-08-08 | 100 | ERRATA re 99 Declaration in Support by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011) (Entered: 08/10/2011) |
2011-08-09 | | ***Deadlines terminated. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) (Entered: 08/09/2011) |
2011-08-09 | 97 | Letter dated 8/8/2011 re: filing of pleadings from Mr. John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) (Entered: 08/10/2011) |
2011-08-09 | 101 | ERRATA re 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011) |
2011-08-09 | 102 | ERRATA re 98 Opposition/Response to Motion by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011) |
2011-08-19 | 103 | Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/24/11, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2011. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011) |
2011-08-19 | 104 | REPLY (re 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 89 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and for MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-E)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011) |
2011-08-19 | 105 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re 104 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011) |
2011-08-22 | 106 | NOTICE by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re 104 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendants' Notice of Errata and Amended Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-E)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011) |
2011-08-22 | 107 | Declaration of Mary C. Potter (Supplemental) in Support of 106 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed byU.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Related document(s) 106 ) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011) |
2011-08-22 | 108 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce re 106 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011) |
2011-09-02 | 109 | Reply 104 Reply to Opposition/Response, by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2011) |
2011-09-02 | 110 | Declaration of John Kelly in Support of 111 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byJohn M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 111 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2011) |
2011-09-06 | 113 | ERRATA re 109 Response ( Non Motion ) by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011) (Entered: 09/13/2011) |
2011-09-06 | 114 | ERRATA re 98 Opposition/Response to Motion by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011) (Entered: 09/13/2011) |
2011-09-07 | 111 | ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF). Mod (Entered: 09/07/2011) |
2011-09-07 | 112 | JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2011) |
2011-10-21 | 115 | **ENTERED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD** AMENDED ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011) Modified on 10/24/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/21/2011) |
2011-11-04 | 116 | NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 111 112 Judgment by John M. Kelly. Filing fee $ 455-#34611066597 (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/07/2011) |
2011-11-07 | 117 | Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 116 Notice of Appeal (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) (Entered: 11/07/2011) |
2011-11-14 | 118 | USCA Case Number 11-17684 Ninth Circuit for 116 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011) |
2011-11-15 | 119 | TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION N/A by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011) |
2011-11-25 | 120 | Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 1/14/2011 & 6/24/2011 before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 11/25/2011) (Entered: 11/25/2011) |
2011-11-29 | 121 | TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering form by John M. Kelly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011) |
2012-02-24 | 123 | Administrative Motion to File Confidential ADR Documents Under Seal filed by John M. Kelly. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012) |
2012-02-24 | 124 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by John M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 123 ) (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012) |
2012-02-27 | 122 | ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS PERTAINING CONFIDENTIAL ADR DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012) |
2013-10-03 | 125 | USCA Memorandum-AFFIRMED in part, Vacated in part, and REMANDED as to 116 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Kelly (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013) (Entered: 10/03/2013) |
2013-11-01 | 126 | ***erroneous entry-duplicate***USCA Memorandum as to -AFFIRMED in part, VACATED in part and REMANDED 116 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Kelly (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013) Modified on 11/1/2013 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2013) |
2013-12-20 | 127 | ORDER of USCA as to 116 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Kelly (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013) |
2014-01-07 | 128 | MANDATE of USCA as to 116 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Kelly (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014) |
2014-01-07 | 129 | CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014) |
2014-01-30 | 130 | CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014) |
2014-03-07 | 131 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014) |
2014-03-07 | 132 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John M. Kelly. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/11/2014) |
2014-03-13 | 133 | CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 12:00 P.M. Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2014 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014) |
2014-03-17 | 134 | Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/14/2014 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 3/17/2014). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014) |
2014-03-25 | 135 | Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-14-2014, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014) |
2014-03-28 | 136 | Supplemental Brief filed byJohn M. Kelly. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 04/01/2014) |
2014-03-31 | 137 | Errata by John M. Kelly re 136 Supplemental Brief (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 04/01/2014) |
2014-04-11 | 138 | Proposed Order and Non-Waiver of Defenses, by U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Simmons, Abraham) (Filed on 4/11/2014) Modified on 4/14/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2014) |
2014-04-18 | 139 | MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply to Proposed Order and Non-Waiver of Defenses, filed by John M. Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) (Entered: 04/18/2014) |
2014-04-18 | 140 | Declaration of John M. Kelly in Support of 139 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply to Proposed Order and Non-Waiver of Defenses, filed by John M. Kelly. (Related document(s) 139 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) (Entered: 04/18/2014) |
2014-04-18 | 141 | Reply to 138 Proposed Order and Non-Waiver of Defenses, filed by John M. Kelly. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) (Entered: 04/18/2014) |
2014-04-24 | 142 | NOTICE OF ERRATA re 141 Reply, filed by John M. Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014) |
2014-10-21 | 143 | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/20/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014) |
2014-10-21 | 144 | JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/20/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014) |
Hide Docket Events |