Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2015-05-01 | 1 | CIVIL COVER SHEET by Timothy M White (Gilbert, Bernadetta) (Entered: 05/01/2015) |
2015-05-01 | 2 | COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1450752) by Timothy M White (With attachments) (Gilbert, Bernadetta) (Entered: 05/01/2015) |
2015-05-04 | 3 | SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Leigh A Bradley, Robert A McDonald (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/04/2015) |
2015-07-06 | 4 | ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cathryn Dawn McClanahan on behalf of Leigh A Bradley, Robert A McDonald (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 07/06/2015) |
2015-07-06 | 5 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by Leigh A Bradley, Robert A McDonald (With attachments) (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 07/06/2015) |
2015-07-16 | 6 | RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by Timothy M White ; (White, Timothy) (Entered: 07/16/2015) |
2015-07-28 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed re: All Defendants (Re: 2 Complaint ) by Timothy M White (Gilbert, Bernadetta) (Entered: 07/28/2015) |
2015-08-07 | 8 | REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by Leigh A Bradley, Robert A McDonald ; (With attachments) (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 08/07/2015) |
2016-03-24 | 9 | OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell granting defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 5). ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; granting 5 Motion for Summary Judgment (Re: 2 Complaint ) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 03/24/2016) |
2016-03-24 | 10 | JUDGMENT by Judge John E Dowdell , entering judgment in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff (terminates case) (Re: 9 Opinion and Order, Dismissing/Terminating Case,, Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment ) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 03/24/2016) |
2016-03-24 | | ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number 10 ) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/24/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |