Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2015-07-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4165625) filed by HOWARD LANGER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Summons)(Koffman, Richard) (Entered: 07/07/2015) |
2015-07-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (rd) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-08 | 2 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Summons not issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General as summons were not submitted at the time of initial filing) (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-08 | 3 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by HOWARD LANGER re 1 Complaint, filed by HOWARD LANGER. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by HOWARD LANGER. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Koffman, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-09 | 4 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 07/09/2015) |
2015-07-09 | 5 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter Leckman, :Firm- Langer Grogan & Diver P.C., :Address- 1717 Arch Street, Suite 4130, Philadelphia, PA 19130. Phone No. - 215-320-0876. Fax No. - 215-320-5703 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4169734. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HOWARD LANGER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Peter Leckman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Koffman, Richard) (Entered: 07/09/2015) |
2015-07-15 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Peter Leckman is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/15/2015. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/15/2015) |
2015-07-28 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/16/2015. (Leckman, Peter) Modified on 7/29/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 07/28/2015) |
2015-07-28 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/15/2015. (Leckman, Peter) Modified dates on 7/29/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 07/28/2015) |
2015-07-28 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/16/2015. (Leckman, Peter) Modified on 7/29/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 07/28/2015) |
2015-07-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/15/2015. (znmw) (Entered: 07/29/2015) |
2015-07-31 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/31/2015) |
2015-08-17 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/17/2015) |
2015-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 2, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/17/2015. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/17/2015) |
2015-08-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/2/2015, (tj) (Entered: 08/19/2015) |
2015-09-02 | 11 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/02/2015) |
2015-09-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before September 16, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/02/2015. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/02/2015) |
2015-09-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet and Confer Conference and Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/16/2015. (tj) (Entered: 09/03/2015) |
2015-09-14 | 12 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Set Briefing Schedule by HOWARD LANGER (Leckman, Peter) (Entered: 09/14/2015) |
2015-09-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Set Briefing Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before September 30, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/14/2015. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2015) |
2015-09-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due by 10/9/2015. Status Report due by 10/5/2015 (tj) (Entered: 09/25/2015) |
2015-09-29 | 13 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Set Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/29/2015) |
2015-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 13 the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time: it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 14, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/29/2015. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/29/2015) |
2015-10-14 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HOWARD LANGER. (Leckman, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2015) |
2015-10-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference before the Court on November 13, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/15/2015. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/15/2015) |
2015-10-16 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/13/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 10/16/2015) |
2015-11-09 | 15 | STIPULATION (Voluntary Stipulation of Settlement and Order of Dismissal) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/09/2015) |
2015-11-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 15 the parties' Voluntary Stipulation of Settlement, the Status Conference scheduled for November 13, 2015 is VACATED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2015. (Entered: 11/10/2015) |
2015-11-10 | 16 | VOLUNTARY STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. See document for details. (Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2015). (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/10/2015) |
Hide Docket Events |