Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2015-07-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4166115) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2015) |
2015-07-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-08 | | SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (sth) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-08 | 2 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by LONNIE J. PARKER filed by LONNIE J. PARKER.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-09 | 3 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (jf) (Entered: 07/09/2015) |
2015-07-10 | 4 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 07/10/2015) |
2015-08-04 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Castellano on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2015) |
2015-08-13 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2015) |
2015-08-18 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Aaron Ziese on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Ziese, Timothy) (Entered: 08/18/2015) |
2015-08-24 | 8 | Joint MOTION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Castellano, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2015) |
2015-10-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint proposed scheduling order, the parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than October 23, 2015; (2) Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than November 23, 2015. If Plaintiff chooses to file a cross-motion, it shall be combined with the opposition and filed on the same date; (3) Defendant's reply and, if applicable, combined opposition shall be filed no later than December 21, 2015; (4) Plaintiff's reply, if applicable, shall be filed no later than January 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 1, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 10/01/2015) |
2015-10-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion Summary Judgment motions due by 10/23/2015. Plaintiff Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment And/Or Cross-Motion due by 11/23/2015. Defendant's Reply, If Applicable, Combined Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2015. Plaintiff's Reply, If Applicable, due by 1/22/2016. (mac) (Entered: 10/01/2015) |
2015-10-23 | 9 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Hardy), # 2 Declaration (Kornmeier), # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Memorandum in Support, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Castellano, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/26/2015 as it was out of memory. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/23/2015) |
2015-11-16 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2015) |
2015-11-20 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 10 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, combined with its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, no later than November 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 20, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 11/20/2015) |
2015-11-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response to Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Combined With Its Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 11/25/2015. (mac) (Entered: 11/20/2015) |
2015-11-25 | 11 | MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points and Authorities by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/25/2015) |
2015-11-25 | 12 | RESPONSE re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/25/2015) |
2015-12-21 | 13 | Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Ziese, Timothy) (Entered: 12/21/2015) |
2015-12-21 | 14 | REPLY re 9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Ziese, Timothy) Modified on 12/21/2015 (jf). (Entered: 12/21/2015) |
2015-12-30 | 15 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/30/2015) |
2016-01-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than January 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 4, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 01/04/2016) |
2016-01-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than January 29, 2016. (ztcr) (Entered: 01/05/2016) |
2016-01-29 | 16 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016) |
2016-08-12 | 17 | ORDER granting Defendant's 9 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 12, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/12/2016) |
2016-08-12 | 18 | MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 12, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/12/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |