Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2015-07-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4169770) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2015) |
2015-07-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md) (Entered: 07/10/2015) |
2015-07-10 | | SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (SUMMONS WERE NOT FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 07/10/2015) |
2015-07-10 | 2 | ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 10, 2015. (NS) (Entered: 07/10/2015) |
2015-07-10 | 3 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by LONNIE J. PARKER filed by LONNIE J. PARKER.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2015) |
2015-07-13 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 07/13/2015) |
2015-08-13 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 08/13/2015) |
2015-08-14 | 6 | ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 9/15/2015. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/14/2015. (lcckk2) (Entered: 08/14/2015) |
2015-09-15 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 09/15/2015) |
2015-09-16 | 8 | ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS's answer now due 9/29/2015. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/16/2015. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/16/2015) |
2015-09-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/29/2015,. (dot) (Entered: 09/28/2015) |
2015-09-29 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS.(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 09/29/2015) |
2015-09-30 | 10 | ORDER re Defendant's 9 Answer. Defendant's Answer states that Defendant has sent letters dated September 11 and 16, 2015 enclosing records responsive to Plaintiff's request. In light of this filing, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report not later than OCTOBER 30, 2015, indicating whether Plaintiff is satisfied with Defendant's response and whether further briefing is necessary to resolve the dispute. If the parties determine that further briefing is necessary, the Joint Status Report shall include a proposed schedule for such briefing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/30/2015. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/30/2015) |
2015-09-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2015. (dot) (Entered: 10/01/2015) |
2015-10-30 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 10/30/2015) |
2015-11-09 | | MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Court is in receipt of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report filed on October 30, 2015, indicating their request for an additional thirty (30) days to work towards resolving any remaining issues. Upon review of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the Court shall grant the Parties' request. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report not later than NOVEMBER 30, 2015, indicating whether they have resolved all outstanding issues. In the event that they are unable to resolve all outstanding issues, the Parties shall file a proposed briefing scheduling to address any issues that remain. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/9/2015. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/09/2015) |
2015-11-10 | | Set/Reset Deadline: The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report not later than 11/30/2015, indicating whether they have resolved all outstanding issues. (kt) (Entered: 11/10/2015) |
2015-11-30 | 12 | Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 11/30/2015) |
2015-12-01 | 13 | ORDER granting the parties' 12 Motion for Briefing Schedule. The parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than February 23, 2016; Plaintiff shall file its Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than March 25, 2016; Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than April 29, 2016; Plaintiff shall file its Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than May 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/1/2015. (lcckk1) (Entered: 12/01/2015) |
2015-12-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motions due by 3/25/2016. Response to Cross Motions due by 4/29/2016. Reply to Cross Motions due by 5/20/2016. Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 2/23/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/25/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/29/2016. (dot) (Entered: 12/10/2015) |
2016-02-18 | 14 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extension of Time for Summary Judgment Briefing by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 02/18/2016) |
2016-02-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 5/20/2016. Response to Cross Motion due by 6/22/2016. Reply to Cross Motion due by 7/15/2016. Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 3/25/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/20/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/22/2016. (dot) (Entered: 02/29/2016) |
2016-02-19 | 15 | ORDER granting Defendant's 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Summary Judgment Briefing. See document for schedule. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/19/2016. (lcckk2) (Entered: 02/19/2016) |
2016-03-24 | 16 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 03/24/2016) |
2016-03-24 | 17 | ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Summary Judgment briefing. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before APRIL 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/24/2016. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/24/2016) |
2016-03-24 | | Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before 4/8/2016. (kt) (Entered: 03/24/2016) |
2016-04-08 | 18 | STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 04/08/2016) |
2016-04-12 | 19 | ORDER. The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle. Accordingly, with the consent of the parties, it is, this 12th day of April, 2016, hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED; the dismissal shall be without prejudice until MAY 3, 2016. Should counsel fail to move to extend the deadline or to reopen this action by the designated date, the matter shall, without further order, stand dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/12/2016. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/12/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |