Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-02-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, United States Department of Justice, United States National Central Bureau, Interpol Washington, filed by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rm) (Entered: 02/12/2016) |
2016-02-12 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima.(rm) (Entered: 02/12/2016) |
2016-02-18 | 3 | ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; clerk directed to issue the admin order to the Warden. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/18/16. (lg) (Entered: 02/18/2016) |
2016-02-18 | 4 | Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, United States Department of Justice, United States National Central Bureau, Interpol Washington and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: # 1 plaintiff packet) (lg) (Entered: 02/18/2016) |
2016-02-18 | 5 | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER sent to York County Prison/Warden. (lg) (Entered: 02/18/2016) |
2016-02-19 | | DOCKET ANNOTATION: copy of 2/17/16 Order of Court, Summons, USM 285 Form and Complaint (2 copies each) to USM Williamsport. (lg) (Entered: 02/19/2016) |
2016-02-26 | 6 | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed on behalf of Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima. (ao) (Entered: 02/26/2016) |
2016-03-14 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM: United States Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy and United States Department of Justice, United States National Central Bureau, Interpol Washington served by certified mai/return receipt green cards dated 3/4/2016; answer due 5/3/2016. (lg) (Entered: 03/16/2016) |
2016-05-17 | 8 | ORDER: Status Report due by 5/31/2016.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/17/16. (km) (Entered: 05/17/2016) |
2016-05-30 | 9 | DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lahoud, Raymond) (Entered: 05/30/2016) |
2016-05-30 | 10 | MOTION for Entry of Default by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Lahoud, Raymond) (Entered: 05/30/2016) |
2016-05-30 | 11 | STATUS REPORT FILED PURSUANT TO AN ORDER OF THE COURT ENTERED MAY 17, 2016 by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lahoud, Raymond) (Entered: 05/30/2016) |
2016-06-07 | 12 | Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to United States Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy and United States Department of Justice, United States National Central Bureau, Interpol Washington. (lg) (Entered: 06/07/2016) |
2016-06-22 | 13 | MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, the United States Department of Justice, National Central Bureau, INTERPOL Washington, and Defendant, the United States Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Default Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Lahoud, Raymond) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-07-13 | 14 | Emergency MOTION for Telephone Conference by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lahoud, Raymond) (Entered: 07/13/2016) |
2016-07-15 | 15 | ***VACATED by ORDER entered 7/18/2016, ECF No. 16***: ORDER: The Defendants shall produce to the Plaintiff by 5:00 p.m. Tuesday, July 19, 2016, all documents in its possession that would aid the Plaintiff in his defense to the 8/2/2016 immigration court proceedings that are not protected by 5 U.S.C. § 552(b)(7)(A). If any documents were withheld from disclosure to Plaintiff pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(b)(7)(A), Defendants shall produce to this Court, under seal, a privilege log, explaining the nature of the documents and the reasons they were withheld by 5:00 p.m. 7/19/2016. If Defendants fail to comply with this Order, a contempt/sanction hearing will be scheduled. The emergency motion for a telephone conference 14 is DENIED. The United States Marshals Service is ORDERED to effect service of this Order on defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/15/16. (Certified Copies of this Order were delivered to the USM-Wmspt.)(km) Modified on 7/18/2016 (km). (Entered: 07/15/2016) |
2016-07-18 | 16 | ORDER: VACATING the Court's Order, entered 7/15/2016, ECF No. 15. A new Order shall issue forethwith. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/18/16. (km) (Entered: 07/18/2016) |
2016-07-18 | 17 | ORDER: The Dfts shall produce to the Plaintiff by 5:00 p.m. 7/26/2016 all documents in its possession that would aid the Plaintiff in his defense to the 8/2/2016 immigration court proceedings that are not protected by 5 U.S.C. § 552(b)(7)(A). If any documents were withheld from disclosure to Plaintiff pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(b)(7)(A), Dfts shall produce to this Court, under seal, a privilege log, explaining the nature of the documents and the reasons they were withheld by 5:00 p.m. 7/26/2016. If Dfts fail to comply with this Order, a contempt/sanction hearing will be scheduled. The emergency motion for a telephone conference 14 is DENIED. The United States Marshals Service is ORDERED to effect service of this Order on defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/18/16. (Certified Copies of this Order were delivered to the USM-Wmspt.)(km) (km) (Entered: 07/18/2016) |
2016-07-27 | 18 | SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference Call set for 7/28/2016 02:30 PM in Williamsport before Honorable Matthew W. Brann.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/27/16. (see order for further/complete details)(lg) (Entered: 07/27/2016) |
2016-07-29 | 20 | ORDER: parties agree to proceed on the merits of the case; plantiff's counsel's oral motion to set aside the entry of default is granted; denying 13 Motion for Default Judgment; dfts will respond to the Freedom Of Information Act request by the close of business 8/1/16. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/29/16. (see order for further/complete details) (lg) (Entered: 07/29/2016) |
2016-07-29 | | DOCKET ANNOTATION: document 21 deleted; inadvertently docketed to this incorrect case. (lg) (Entered: 07/29/2016) |
2016-08-01 | 21 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, United States Department of Justice, United States National Central Bureau, Interpol Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Simpson, D.) (Entered: 08/01/2016) |
2016-08-01 | 22 | BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, United States Department of Justice, United States National Central Bureau, Interpol Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibits/Vaughn Index, # 3 Unpublished Opinion)(Simpson, D.) (Entered: 08/01/2016) |
2016-08-05 | 23 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pedro Elias Hernandez-Lima (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Lahoud, Raymond) (Entered: 08/05/2016) |
2016-08-09 | 24 | ORDER: DISMISSING case without prejudice. DIRECTING the clerk to close this the case.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/9/16. (km) (Entered: 08/09/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |