Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-04-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT filed by Hani El-Khader; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11869673. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A FOIA request, # 2 Exhibit B FOIA receipt, # 3 Exhibit C FOIA result cover letter, # 4 Exhibit D1 FOIA result, # 5 Exhibit D2 FOIA result, # 6 Exhibit D3 FOIA result, # 7 Exhibit D4 FOIA result, # 8 Exhibit D5 FOIA result, # 9 Exhibit D6 FOIA result, # 10 Exhibit D7 FOIA result, # 11 Exhibit D8 FOIA result, # 12 Exhibit D9 FOIA result, # 13 Exhibit E FOIA appeal, # 14 Exhibit F FOIA appeal result cover letter, # 15 Exhibit G FOIA appeal result, # 16 Exhibit H DOS refusal)(Baldini Potermin, Maria) (Entered: 04/27/2016) |
2016-04-27 | 2 | CIVIL Cover Sheet (Baldini Potermin, Maria) (Entered: 04/27/2016) |
2016-04-27 | 3 | ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hani El-Khader by Maria Theresa Baldini Potermin (Baldini Potermin, Maria) (Entered: 04/27/2016) |
2016-04-27 | | CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (ew, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016) |
2016-04-27 | | SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jn, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016) |
2016-05-12 | 4 | DESIGNATION of Prashant Kolluri as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Jeh Johnson, Leon Rodriguez, Sarah R. Saldana (Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 05/12/2016) |
2016-05-20 | 5 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 7/5/2016 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 05/20/2016) |
2016-06-16 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by Jeh Johnson, Leon Rodriguez, Sarah R. Saldana(Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 06/16/2016) |
2016-07-01 | 7 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing set for 7/5/2016 is stricken and reset for 7/7/2016 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 07/01/2016) |
2016-07-07 | 8 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 8/23/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016) |
2016-08-23 | 9 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by 10/24/2016. Response is due by 11/28/2016. Reply is due by 12/12/2016. Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 08/23/2016) |
2016-10-24 | 10 | MOTION by Defendants Sarah R. Saldana, Leon Rodriguez, Jeh Johnson for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support)(Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 10/24/2016) |
2016-10-24 | 11 | LR 56.1 Statement of Material Facts in Support of Summary Judgment by Jeh Johnson, Leon Rodriguez, Sarah R. Saldana (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 10/24/2016) |
2016-11-28 | 12 | MOTION by Plaintiff Hani Hasan Ahmad El Khader for extension of time to file response/reply until 12/5/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel)(Baldini Potermin, Maria) (Entered: 11/28/2016) |
2016-12-02 | 13 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) (Kolluri, Prashant) (Entered: 12/02/2016) |
2016-12-02 | 14 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 12/2/2016, IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, through their respective counsel, that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party agrees to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 12/02/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |
|