Robert Kasper, a Vietnam veteran suffering from exposure to Agent Orange, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for his claims file so that he could file a disabilities claim. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and promised Kasper's attorney that it would process the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kasper filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Leroy Kasper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit Summons, # 4 Exhibit Summons)(Champion, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-27
2
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert Leroy Kasper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kasper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Champion Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Attachment A, # 4 Exhibit Attachment B, # 5 Exhibit Attachment C, # 6 Exhibit Attachment D, # 7 Exhibit Attachment E, # 8 Proposed Order)(Champion, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-27
Case Assigned to Judge Robert A. Junell. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-05-12
3
NOTICE of Settlement by Robert Leroy Kasper (Champion, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-13
4
ORDER, this case is administratively closed without prejudice to its being reopened to enter an order of dismissal or to enter other orders if the settlement is not consummated. DENYING AS MOOT 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING AS MOOT 2 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (se) (Entered: 05/18/2016)