Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-05-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616077488) with Jury Demand filed by EDWARD RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 05/09/2016) |
2016-05-09 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EDWARD RICHARDSON. Case related to Case No. 16-0794. (jf) (Entered: 05/09/2016) |
2016-05-09 | | Summons (1) Issued as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (jf) (Entered: 05/09/2016) |
2016-05-13 | | SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jd) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-19 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM served on 5/16/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/16/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/15/2016.) (jf) (Entered: 05/23/2016) |
2016-06-01 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/01/2016) |
2016-06-09 | 5 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. Case related to Case No. 14-1673; 16-794. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/09/2016) |
2016-06-20 | 6 | MOTION to Consolidate Cases by EDWARD RICHARDSON (jf) (Entered: 06/21/2016) |
2016-06-20 | 7 | MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Service of Process in Related Case by EDWARD RICHARDSON (jf) (Entered: 06/21/2016) |
2016-07-07 | 8 | Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION to Stay, 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/07/2016) |
2016-07-08 | 9 | MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by EDWARD RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(jf) (Entered: 07/11/2016) |
2016-07-11 | 10 | MOTION to Strike 5 Notice of Related Case by EDWARD RICHARDSON (jf) (Entered: 07/12/2016) |
2016-07-12 | 14 | Case directly reassigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer as related to 14-cv-01673-RMC. Judge Richard J. Leon no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 07/15/2016) |
2016-07-14 | 11 | MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Mem. Op., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/14/2016) |
2016-07-14 | 12 | MOTION for CM/ECF Password by EDWARD RICHARDSON (jf) (Entered: 07/15/2016) |
2016-07-14 | 13 | REPLY re 7 MOTION to Stay, 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by EDWARD RICHARDSON. (jf) (Entered: 07/15/2016) |
2016-07-21 | 15 | Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Strike 5 Notice of Related Case filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/21/2016) |
2016-07-22 | | MINUTE ORDER denying 6 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying 7 Motion to Stay Proceedings; granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; denying 10 Motion to Strike 5 Notice of Related Case; and denying 12 Motion for CM/ECF Password as moot. Plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint no later than August 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/22/2016.....VACATED IN PART PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 5/25/2017..... (lcrmc2) Modified on 5/26/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/22/2016) |
2016-07-22 | 17 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM with Jury Demand filed by EDWARD RICHARDSON.(zrdj) (Entered: 07/25/2016) |
2016-07-25 | 16 | NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne F. Mizusawa on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Mizusawa, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/25/2016) |
2016-07-25 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Yonatan Gelblum on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 07/25/2016) |
2016-07-25 | 19 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM re 18 Notice of Appearance, 16 Notice of Appearance . (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 07/25/2016) |
2016-07-25 | | MINUTE ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice in light of 17 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/25/2016. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 07/25/2016) |
2016-08-04 | 20 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand filed by EDWARD RICHARDSON.(zrdj) (Entered: 08/05/2016) |
2016-08-04 | | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General in re 20 Amended Complaint. (md) (Entered: 08/05/2016) |
2016-08-05 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring Defendants to respond to 20 Amended Complaint and provide position on whether Plaintiff should be granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' response shall be filed no later than August 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/5/2016. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 08/05/2016) |
2016-08-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Amended Complaint due by 8/29/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/08/2016) |
2016-08-08 | 21 | MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED CIVIL COMPLAINT by EDWARD RICHARDSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/10/2016) |
2016-08-29 | 22 | MOTION to Dismiss For Falure To State A Claim And , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/29/2016) |
2016-09-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File 20 Second Amended Complaint as of August 4, 2016. 20 Second Amended Complaint has already been filed and Defendants have responded. Plaintiff shall not refile the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/8/2016. (DAS) (Entered: 09/08/2016) |
2016-09-08 | 23 | ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to 22 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, or the Court may deem the matter conceded. Plaintiff's response is due by October 24, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/8/2016. (DAS) (Entered: 09/08/2016) |
2016-09-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to 22 due by 10/24/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 09/08/2016) |
2016-10-24 | 24 | Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to Dismiss For Falure To State A Claim And MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EDWARD RICHARDSON. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/26/2016) |
2016-11-03 | 25 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss For Falure To State A Claim And MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/03/2016) |
2017-03-31 | 26 | MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/31/2017. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 03/31/2017) |
2017-03-31 | 27 | ORDER granting in part and denying in part [Dkt. 22] Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/31/2017. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 03/31/2017) |
2017-04-12 | 28 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 20 Amended Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/12/2017) |
2017-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve shall file an Answer no later than May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/12/2017. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 04/12/2017) |
2017-04-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve's Answer to Amended Complaint due by 5/5/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 04/13/2017) |
2017-05-04 | 29 | MOTION for Reconsideration re 27 Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/04/2017) |
2017-05-19 | 30 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 29 MOTION for Reconsideration re 27 Order by EDWARD RICHARDSON (jf) (Entered: 05/22/2017) |
2017-05-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration shall be filed no later than May 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/22/2017. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 05/22/2017) |
2017-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to 29 due by 5/29/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 05/23/2017) |
2017-05-25 | 31 | ORDER vacating the Court's ruling in a Minute Order dated 7/22/2016 denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password and granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/25/2017. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 05/25/2017) |
2017-05-30 | 32 | Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION for Reconsideration re 27 Order filed by EDWARD RICHARDSON. (jf) (Entered: 05/30/2017) |
2017-06-06 | 33 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION for Reconsideration re 27 Order filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/06/2017) |
2017-06-07 | 34 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 33 Reply to opposition to Motion . (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/07/2017) |
2018-01-26 | 35 | MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/26/2018. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 01/26/2018) |
2018-01-26 | 36 | ORDER granting 29 Motion for Reconsideration. Counts Two and Six in 20 Second Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/26/2018. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 01/26/2018) |
Hide Docket Events |