Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-05-13 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Health and Human Services Department of filed by Diagnostic Imaging Group, John Hamlin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Freedom of Information Letter, # 2 Exhibit 2 Certified Mail Receipt, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kr) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-13 | | PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 5:16-cv-00511-F Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2285451. (Hamlin, John) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-13 | 2 | Summons Issued Electronically as to Health and Human Services Department of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kr) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-13 | 3 | ENTRY of Appearance by John P Hamlin on behalf of Diagnostic Imaging Group (Hamlin, John) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-13 | 4 | ENTRY of Appearance by John P Hamlin on behalf of John Hamlin (Hamlin, John) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-13 | 5 | NOTICE (other) by Diagnostic Imaging Group Disclosure Statement for Diagnostic Imaging Group (Hamlin, John) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-24 | 6 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney, Civil Processing Clerk on May 17, 2016, filed by Plaintiffs Diagnostic Imaging Group, John Hamlin. (Hamlin, John) (Entered: 05/24/2016) |
2016-05-31 | 7 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on Ms. Loretta E. Lynch, Esq., Attorney General on May 23, 2016, filed by Plaintiffs Diagnostic Imaging Group, John Hamlin. (Hamlin, John) (Entered: 05/31/2016) |
2016-05-31 | 8 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. Health and Human Services Department of served on 5/19/2016. (Hamlin, John) (Entered: 05/31/2016) |
2016-06-02 | 9 | ENTRY of Appearance by Kay D Sewell on behalf of Health and Human Services Department of (Sewell, Kay) (Entered: 06/02/2016) |
2016-06-02 | 10 | UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Response by Health and Human Services Department of. (Sewell, Kay) (Entered: 06/02/2016) |
2016-06-02 | 11 | ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Health and Human Services Department of answer or other responsive pldg due 7/18/2016. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/2/16. (llg) (Entered: 06/02/2016) |
2016-06-03 | 12 | AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to 1 Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Letter to Defendant, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Letter Proof of Certified Mail, # 3 Exhibit Defendants Letter Disclosing FOIA Officer's Address, # 4 Exhibit HHS Captured Website Disclosing FOIA Officer's Address)(Hamlin, John) (Entered: 06/03/2016) |
2016-06-03 | | AMENDED COMPLAINT against Health and Human Services Department of filed by Diagnostic Imaging Group, John Hamlin (SEE DOC. NO. 12 FOR IMAGE).(llg) (Entered: 06/13/2016) |
2016-07-18 | 13 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint by Plaintiffs and Defendant) by Health and Human Services Department of. (Sewell, Kay) (Entered: 07/18/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |