Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-05-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6028150.), filed by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons to US Department of Homeland Security, # 12 Summons to US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 13 Summons to US Citizenship and Immigration Services)(Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 05/20/2016) |
2016-05-24 | 2 | [FILED IN ERROR, REFILED AS 3 ]NOTICE by Mirna R Artiga Carrero re 1 Complaint,, For the Clerk to Issue Summonses (Goldstein, Daniel) Modified on 5/26/2016 (nd2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/24/2016) |
2016-05-25 | 3 | NOTICE by Mirna R Artiga Carrero re 1 Complaint,, For Clerk to issue Summonses (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2016) |
2016-05-26 | 4 | Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (nd2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/26/2016) |
2016-06-17 | 5 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/31/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | 6 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 5/31/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 5/31/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | 8 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. All Defendants. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | 9 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. All Defendants. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2016) |
2016-06-30 | 10 | MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Cover Letter from ICE Producing 89 Pages of Records to Plaintiff's Counsel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Neil) (Entered: 06/30/2016) |
2016-07-14 | 11 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. Responses due by 8/1/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Docherty, Kevin) (Entered: 07/14/2016) |
2016-07-14 | 12 | ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 7/14/2016. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/14/2016) |
2016-08-04 | 13 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mirna R Artiga Carrero (Docherty, Kevin) (Entered: 08/04/2016) |
2016-08-08 | 14 | MARGINAL ORDER approving 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Mirna R Artiga Carrero. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 8/8/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/09/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |