Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-06-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Federal Emergency Management Agency ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-8588184). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Trident Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2016) |
2016-06-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 06/21/2016) |
2016-06-20 | | If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mathy. (rg) (Entered: 06/21/2016) |
2016-07-07 | 2 | ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, COMPLAINT FILED AS A REQUEST FOR SUMMONS. ****REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trident Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Martin, Christopher) Modified on 7/8/2016 (wg). (Entered: 07/07/2016) |
2016-07-08 | 3 | ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL, WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED TO EVENT *** DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 2 Request for Issuance of Summons (wg) (Entered: 07/08/2016) |
2016-07-08 | 4 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trident Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Martin, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2016) |
2016-07-11 | 5 | Summons Issued as to Federal Emergency Management Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wg) (Entered: 07/11/2016) |
2016-08-10 | 6 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2016) |
2016-08-11 | 7 | ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Federal Emergency Management Agency answer due 9/22/2016. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 08/11/2016) |
2016-09-22 | 8 | Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Emergency Management Agency.(Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2016) |
2016-09-28 | 9 | ORDER the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. The parties are to also notify the court on whether or not they consent to US Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 09/28/2016) |
2016-10-27 | 10 | NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 10/27/2016) |
2016-10-28 | 11 | NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Trident Insurance Services, LLC. (Farrell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2016) |
2016-11-16 | 12 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEMA and by Trident Insurance Services, LLC. (Farrell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/16/2016) |
2016-11-16 | 13 | NOTICE of Filing Agreed Order of Dismissal by FEMA and by Trident Insurance Services, LLC (Farrell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/16/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |