Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-06-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed by OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-3940389) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Original FOIA request with attachment, # 2 Exhibit 2- BOA acknowledgement letter, # 3 Exhibit 3- Email narrowing request with attachment, # 4 Exhibit 4- First Letter Appeal, # 5 Exhibit 5- Response first letter appeal, # 6 Exhibit 6- Second letter appeal, # 7 Exhibit 7- Response to second letter appeal)(Overhauser, Paul) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-22 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Overhauser on behalf of Plaintiff OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC. (Overhauser, Paul) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-22 | 3 | Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Overhauser, Paul) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-22 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kathrine D. Jack on behalf of Plaintiff OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC. (Jack, Kathrine) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-23 | 5 | Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (AAM) (Entered: 06/23/2016) |
2016-06-23 | 6 | MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAM) (Entered: 06/23/2016) |
2016-06-27 | 7 | ***RESCINDED PER Entry 8 *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:14-ml-2570. Judge Sarah Evans Barker and Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/27/2016. (TMD) Modified on 6/27/2016 (TMD). (Entered: 06/27/2016) |
2016-06-27 | 8 | ENTRY RESCINDING 7 Reassignment Order. Clerk DIRECTED to take no action regarding reassignment. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/27/2016.(TMD) (Entered: 06/27/2016) |
2016-07-29 | 9 | NOTICE of Proof of Service , filed by Plaintiff OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Proof Of Service Department of Justice, # 2 Exhibit 2-Proof of Service US Attorneys Office) (Overhauser, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2016) |
2016-07-29 | 10 | NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Julian, Jill) (Entered: 07/29/2016) |
2016-07-29 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Z. Julian on behalf of Defendant DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Julian, Jill) (Entered: 07/29/2016) |
2016-08-03 | 12 | SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2016 02:45 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/3/2016.(SWM) (Entered: 08/04/2016) |
2016-08-26 | 14 | Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC . (Jack, Kathrine) (Entered: 08/26/2016) |
2016-08-26 | 15 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint , filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Julian, Jill) (Entered: 08/26/2016) |
2016-09-02 | 16 | MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/2/2016. Status Conference set for 9/21/2016 at 10:45 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) (Entered: 09/02/2016) |
2016-09-21 | 18 | MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 9/21/2016. Plaintiff's motion regarding costs and attorney's fees shall be filed on or before October 31, 2016. The Defendant's response shall be filed on or before December 9, 2016. The Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before December 20, 2016. Status Conference set for 1/3/2017 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) (Entered: 09/23/2016) |
2016-10-31 | 19 | MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs , filed by Plaintiff OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Kathrine D. Jack, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Pepperball Technologies, Inc. - SEC Filing of January 9, 2012, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order)(Jack, Kathrine) (Entered: 10/31/2016) |
2016-12-09 | 20 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs , filed by Defendant DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Third Amended Counterclaim, # 2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Second Motion, # 3 Exhibit 3-Exhibit in Support, # 4 Exhibit 4-STS Energy Partners Memorandum Opinion)(Julian, Jill) (Entered: 12/09/2016) |
2016-12-20 | 21 | REPLY in Support of Motion re 19 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs , filed by Plaintiff OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Partial List of Cases Where Paul B. Overhauser Appeared, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment Against Shamrock Building Services, Inc., # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Paul B. Overhauser)(Jack, Kathrine) (Entered: 12/20/2016) |
2017-01-06 | 23 | MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 1/6/2017. Parties were represented by counsel. No further orders are entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) (Entered: 01/09/2017) |
2017-01-22 | 24 | ORDER: This cause is before the Court on the Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs. (Docket No. 19). The Court has been advised by counsel that an agreement has been reached as to counsels' dispute in the above-listed motion. Accordingly, the Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs is DENIED, without prejudice, as moot. Parties shall file a stipulation indicating that an agreement has been reached within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/22/2017. (SWM) (Entered: 01/23/2017) |
2017-02-14 | 25 | Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order 1 - Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Jack, Kathrine) (Entered: 02/14/2017) |
2017-02-15 | 26 | CLOSED DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/15/2017.(CBU) (Entered: 02/16/2017) |
Hide Docket Events |