Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-10-24 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4718497) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Agency Defendant, # 3 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 4 Summons US Attorney General)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 10/24/2016) |
2016-10-24 | 2 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 10/24/2016) |
2016-10-25 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sb) (Entered: 10/25/2016) |
2016-10-25 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 10/25/2016) |
2016-10-31 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/31/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 10/31/2016) |
2016-10-31 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/16. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 10/31/2016) |
2016-10-31 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 10/31/2016 (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 10/31/2016) |
2016-10-31 | 7 | ERRATA Corrected Declaration of Service by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 10/31/2016) |
2016-10-31 | 8 | ERRATA Corrected Declaration of Service by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY 5 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 10/31/2016) |
2016-11-30 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 11/30/2016) |
2016-11-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before December 7, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/30/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/30/2016) |
2016-12-07 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 12/07/2016) |
2016-12-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 22, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/7/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/07/2016) |
2016-12-22 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 12/22/2016) |
2016-12-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 6, 2017, the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report, which shall include a briefing schedule if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/22/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/22/2016) |
2016-12-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/6/2017 (tj) (Entered: 12/22/2016) |
2017-02-06 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 02/06/2017) |
2017-02-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before March 8, 2017. The joint status report shall either inform the Court of the resolution of all remaining issues or include a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/6/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/06/2017) |
2017-03-07 | 13 | MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Amended and supplemental complaint proposed for filing)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 03/07/2017) |
2017-03-08 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 03/08/2017) |
2017-03-08 | | SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall oppose 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint on or before March 21, 2017 and Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before March 28, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within ten days of the Court's decision on Plaintiff's motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/8/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/08/2017) |
2017-03-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/21/2017 Replies due by 3/28/2017. (tj) (Entered: 03/08/2017) |
2017-03-21 | 15 | Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 03/21/2017) |
2017-03-28 | 16 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - February 1, 2017 EPA email, # 2 Supplement Revised amended and supplemental complaint)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 03/28/2017) |
2017-03-28 | 17 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY Substituting for attorney Wynne Patrick Kelly (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/28/2017) |
2017-04-05 | 18 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paula Naomi Dinerstein on behalf of PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY Substituting for attorney Laura Marie Colangelo Dumais (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/05/2017) |
2017-05-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint. The Court has considered 15 Defendant's opposition, including Defendant's argument that amendment will delay the instant action. However, because the instant action is relatively new and no briefing or other substantive activity has yet occurred, any delay would be insignificant. Furthermore, the Court notes that leave to amend is to be liberally granted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that 13 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that [16-2] Plaintiff's Amended and Supplemental Complaint, as attached to its reply, is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/8/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/08/2017) |
2017-05-08 | 19 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY.(znmw) (Main Document 19 replaced on 5/9/2017) (jf). (Entered: 05/09/2017) |
2017-05-22 | 20 | ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. Related document: 19 Amended Complaint filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/22/2017) |
2017-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before June 6, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/23/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/23/2017) |
2017-05-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/6/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/23/2017) |
2017-05-25 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/25/2017) |
2017-05-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall continue to process at least 1000 potentially responsive documents per month and to release records each month on or before the 10th day of the month. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file joint status reports every 60 days, with the first status report filed on or before June 26, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/25/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/25/2017) |
2017-05-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/26/2017) |
2017-06-26 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/26/2017) |
2017-08-25 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/25/2017) |
2017-10-25 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/25/2017) |
2017-11-02 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/02/2017) |
2017-11-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the recent assignment of this case to Judge McFadden, the parties are advised that the pre-existing schedule for this case remains in effect. The parties shall comply with all deadlines as previously ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2017. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/16/2017) |
2017-12-20 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/20/2017) |
2018-02-20 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/20/2018) |
2018-04-03 | 27 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sherri L. Morgan on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 04/03/2018) |
2018-04-04 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 27 Notice of Appearance; emailed to sherri.morgan@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Incorrect document/case, 3. Please refile document, 4. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect document/Incorrect case caption and number. Please refile. (znmw, ) (Entered: 04/04/2018) |
2018-04-04 | 28 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sherri L. Morgan on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 04/04/2018) |
2018-04-20 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 04/20/2018) |
2018-04-20 | 30 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/20/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 06/19/2018) |
2018-08-17 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 08/17/2018) |
2018-10-25 | | MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On May 25, 2017, the Court ordered the parties to file joint status reports every 60 days, beginning on June 26, 2017. A Joint Status Report was due October 16, 2018, yet none was filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause on or before November 26, 2018 explaining why its complaint should not be dismissed for a failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/25/2018. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/25/2018) |
2018-10-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause due by 11/26/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 10/25/2018) |
2018-11-06 | 33 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File nunc pro tunc by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 11/06/2018) |
2018-11-06 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 11/06/2018) |
2018-11-07 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before January 7, 2019, and every 60 days thereafter until directed otherwise by the Court. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/7/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/07/2018) |
2018-11-07 | 35 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY Substituting for attorney Sherri L. Morgan (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/07/2018) |
2018-11-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2019, and every 60 days thereafter. (hmc) (Entered: 11/07/2018) |
2019-01-03 | 36 | Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/03/2019) |
2019-01-03 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Motion to Stay. Upon considering the Defendant's 36 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that the Defendant will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/3/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/03/2019) |
2019-01-30 | 37 | NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The stay in this case is hereby lifted. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before February 7, 2019 and every 60 days thereafter until directed otherwise by the Court. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/30/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-30 | 38 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. Attorney Damon William Taaffe terminated. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2019, and every 60 days thereafter. (hmc) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-02-06 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 40 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-06-06 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 06/06/2019) |
2019-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED file a joint status report by July 30, 2019 and then to appear for a status conference on August 5, 2019 at 10 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/8/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/08/2019) |
2019-07-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2019; Status Conference scheduled for 8/5/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (tg) (Entered: 07/09/2019) |
2019-07-24 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-07-24 | 43 | Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-07-26 | | MINUTE ORDER granting, in part, 43 Motion to Continue. The previously scheduled Status Conference shall now be held on September 17, 2019 at 10 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/26/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/26/2019) |
2019-07-26 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference rescheduled for 9/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 07/26/2019) |
2019-09-17 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Status Conference held on 9/17/2019. Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2019. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (hmc) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-10-25 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report on or before November 22, 2019, advising the Court of the status of settlement negotiations and, if necessary, a Proposed Scheduling Order for further proceedings in this matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/28/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-10-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-11-22 | 45 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-11-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 45 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before January 16, 2020, advising the Court of a proposed schedule for further proceedings in this matter. If the parties reach a settlement before January 16, 2020, then they shall promptly inform the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/22/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2020-01-16 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 01/16/2020) |
2020-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 46 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before February 19, 2020, addressing the status of settlement negotiations. If the parties reach a settlement before February 19, 2020, they shall promptly inform the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/17/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-01-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-02-19 | 47 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/19/2020) |
2020-02-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 47 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on March 23, 2020, at 10 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. If the parties reach a settlement before March 23, 2020, they shall promptly inform the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/20/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-02-20 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-03-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Status Conference scheduled for March 23, 2020, is hereby VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report addressing the progress of Plaintiff's fee request on or before April 16, 2020. If the parties reach a settlement before April 16, 2020, they shall promptly inform the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/16/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/16/2020) |
2020-03-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-04-16 | 48 | STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
2020-04-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 48 Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice according to the terms of the stipulation. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/17/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |