Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2017-05-18 | 1 | Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Richard J. Angell, Noranda Mining is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 05/18/2017) |
2017-05-18 | 2 | COMPLAINT against US Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2758013) filed by Richard J. Angell, Noranda Mining. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Corey, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/18/2017) |
2017-05-18 | 3 | CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiffs Richard J. Angell, Noranda Mining. (Corey, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/18/2017) |
2017-05-22 | 4 | **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to US Department of Justice. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 05/22/2017) |
2017-05-25 | 5 | **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard J. Angell, Noranda Mining as to US Department of Justice served on 5/23/2017, answer due 6/13/2017. (Corey, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/25/2017) |
2017-06-12 | 6 | CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/12/17. (ss) (Entered: 06/12/2017) |
2017-06-14 | 7 | Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant US Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Jared C. Bennett added to party US Department of Justice(pty:dft)(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 06/14/2017) |
2017-06-14 | 8 | ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/13/17. (ss) (Entered: 06/14/2017) |
2017-06-15 | 9 | ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for US Department of Justice answer due 6/29/2017. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/14/17. (jlw) (Entered: 06/15/2017) |
2017-06-29 | 10 | Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant US Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 06/29/2017) |
2017-06-30 | 11 | ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support . Answer deadline updated for US Department of Justice answer due 7/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/30/17. (jlw) (Entered: 07/02/2017) |
2017-07-06 | 12 | ANSWER to Complaint filed by US Department of Justice.(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 07/06/2017) |
2017-12-22 | 13 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant US Department of Justice (Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 12/22/2017) |
2017-12-27 | | Civil Case Terminated per 13 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to case. (jds) (Entered: 12/27/2017) |
Hide Docket Events |