Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-11-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FARM SERVICE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5812738) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons for Defendant)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-28 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-28 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kellan Smith, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento St., 2nd Flr., San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5812809. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-28 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kellan Smith. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/29/2018. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2018-11-29 | 4 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/29/2018. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2018-11-29 | 5 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2019-01-04 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY served on 12/4/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/10/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/6/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/5/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 01/04/2019) |
2019-01-04 | 7 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/04/2019) |
2019-01-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion to Stay. Upon considering the Defendant's 7 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that the Defendant will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/4/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/04/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 8 | NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer and then propose to the Court a deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 7, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/28/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' proposed deadline for the Defendant to respond to the Complaint due by 2/7/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-02-06 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-02-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Defendant is hereby ORDERED to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/7/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/07/2019) |
2019-02-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 2/28/2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/07/2019) |
2019-02-11 | 10 | NOTICE of Change of Address by George A. Kimbrell (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 02/11/2019) |
2019-02-28 | 11 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/28/2019) |
2019-02-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/28/2019) |
2019-02-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 02/28/2019) |
2019-03-07 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/07/2019) |
2019-03-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before April 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/11/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 13 | NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Smith, Kellan) Modified on 3/22/2019 to correct docket event/text (jf). (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-29 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-04-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before May 30, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/30/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/30/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 15 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report, including a briefing schedule if necessary, on or before June 27, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/29/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-26 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/26/2019) |
2019-06-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report, including a briefing schedule if necessary, on or before July 30, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/27/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 06/27/2019) |
2019-07-30 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/30/2019) |
2019-07-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report, including a briefing schedule if necessary, on or before September 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/31/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-09-05 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before October 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/5/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-10-23 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on November 13, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/24/2019. (lctnm1). (Entered: 10/24/2019) |
2019-10-25 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 20 | Joint MOTION to Vacate Status Conference of November 13, 2019 by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) Modified on 11/6/2019 to add docket entry relationship (ztth). (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 20 Joint Motion to Vacate Status Conference, the Status Conference scheduled for November 13, 2019, is hereby VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on December 10, 2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. If the parties reach a settlement before December 10, 2019, they shall promptly inform the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/04/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-05 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference rescheduled for 12/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 21 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victoria Yundt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6508959. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria Yundt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Victoria Yundt. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/6/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-11-07 | 22 | NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Yundt on behalf of CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Yundt, Victoria) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 23 | MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yundt, Victoria) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-11-27 | | MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. The parties shall appear for a Status Conference on December 10, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden, as previously ordered. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/27/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 24 | NOTICE of Settlement in Principle and Motion to Vacate Status Conference by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Yundt, Victoria) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 25 | MOTION to Vacate Status Conference by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (ztth) Modified on 12/5/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 24 Notice of Settlement in Principle and Motion to Vacate Status Conference, the Status Conference scheduled for December 10, 2019, is hereby VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on December 20, 2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. If the parties reach a settlement before December 20, 2019, they shall promptly inform the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/05/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 26 | STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE FARM SERVICE AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 26 Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice per the terms of the stipulation. The Status Conference scheduled for December 20, 2019, is hereby VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/18/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |