Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5872954) filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - HUD Letter to DCHA re: Demolition dated January 20, 2017, # 2 Exhibit B - DCHA Response to Zoning Decision dated April 27, 2018, # 3 Exhibit C - FOIA Request Letter dated June 11, 2018, # 4 Exhibit D - HUD Response to FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit E - FOIA Request Follow-up Emails, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2019) |
2019-01-08 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019) |
2019-01-08 | 2 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019) |
2019-01-17 | 3 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO UNITED STATES ATTORNEY AND U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL re 1 Complaint,, filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/17/2019) |
2019-01-17 | 4 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests from Plaintiff. (Edmondson, Joseph) Modified event on 1/18/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/17/2019) |
2019-01-18 | 5 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-24 | 6 | ERRATA Exhibit E by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS 1 Complaint,, filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/24/2019) |
2019-02-25 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Scott)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 02/25/2019) |
2019-02-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report, including a proposed briefing schedule, by March 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 25, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/25/2019) |
2019-02-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/12/2019; Status Report due by 3/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 02/26/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 8 | ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) Modified on 3/13/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 8 Status Report was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with the correct case number on document. (ztd) (Entered: 03/13/2019) |
2019-03-13 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 03/13/2019) |
2019-03-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by April 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 13, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/13/2019) |
2019-03-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/11/2019. (tj) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-04-11 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by May 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 11, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-04-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/13/2019. (tj) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-05-13 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by June 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 13, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/13/2019 (tj) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by July 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 13, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-07-12 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-07-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by August 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 12, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-08-13 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-08-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by October 3, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 13, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-08-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/3/2019. (tj) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 4, 2019, unless by that time the parties have submitted a joint stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/04/2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 4, 2019, unless by that time the parties have submitted a joint stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/5/2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 17 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michelle D. Jackson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Denise M. Clark (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 3, 2020, unless by that time the parties have submitted a joint stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/5/2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/3/2020 (tj) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2020-01-03 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 01/03/2020) |
2020-01-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 3, 2020, unless by that time the parties have submitted a joint stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/6/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/06/2020) |
2020-01-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/3/2020. (tj) (Entered: 01/09/2020) |
2020-02-04 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before March 5, 2020, unless by that time the parties have submitted a joint stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/4/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/5/2020. (tj) (Entered: 02/05/2020) |
2020-03-05 | 21 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
2020-03-05 | 22 | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2020). (tj) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |