Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT filed by Michael Chatman. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 109714) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-30 | 2 | NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 1/30/2019. (rjs) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-30 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 2 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (rjs) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-02-05 | | Notification of Docket Correction: Magistrate Judge King Referred In Error (aar) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-08-13 | 3 | Return of Service Executed by Michael Chatman. (rjs) (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2020-03-20 | 4 | General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (anc) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-03-20 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 4 Order. (anc) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-04-02 | 5 | Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-02 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 5 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-05-04 | 6 | SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (rvb) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020) |
2020-05-05 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 6 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-05-27 | 7 | THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (rvb) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020) |
2020-05-27 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 7 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 05/27/2020) |
2020-07-02 | 8 | FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-07-02 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 8 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-07-13 | 9 | FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (rvb) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020) |
2020-07-13 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 9 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 07/13/2020) |
2020-08-04 | 10 | SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020) |
2020-08-04 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 10 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 08/04/2020) |
2020-09-02 | 11 | SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (rvb) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020) |
2020-09-03 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 11 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020) |
2020-09-29 | 12 | EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020) |
2020-09-29 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 12 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 09/29/2020) |
2020-12-09 | 13 | NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (rvb) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2020-12-09 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 13 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2020-12-30 | 14 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is given notice that he must SHOW CAUSE to this Court within fourteen (14) days as to why service of process has not been timely effected upon Defendants, or, alternatively, that service has in fact been properly effected. Failure to make such a showing to this Court will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/30/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2020-12-30 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 14 Order to Show Cause. (rjs) (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2021-01-20 | | Submission of 14 Order to Show Cause to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs) (Entered: 01/20/2021) |
2021-01-21 | 15 | ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to effectuate service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). This civil action is TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/21/2021. (rjs) (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
2021-01-21 | 16 | CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (rjs)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
2021-01-21 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 15 Order and 16 Clerk's Judgment. (rjs) (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
2021-01-21 | | Civil Case Terminated. (rjs) (Entered: 01/21/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |