Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5947941) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-02-14 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-02-14 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-02-14 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-04-24 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 04/24/2019) |
2019-04-24 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 04/24/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 7 | MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 9, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/25/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/9/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-05-09 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 05/09/2019) |
2019-05-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report outlining Defendant's search and production efforts on or before August 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/09/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/09/2019) |
2019-05-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-08-30 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 08/30/2019) |
2019-08-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before October 9, 2019, which advises the court whether any disputes remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/30/2019) |
2019-09-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2019. (mac) (Entered: 09/03/2019) |
2019-10-09 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2019-10-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by November 13, 2019, which advises whether summary judgment briefing will be necessary and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/11/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/11/2019) |
2019-10-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-11-13 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019) |
2019-11-14 | 12 | ORDER entering the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before December 20, 2019; (2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before January 17, 2020; (3) Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before February 7, 2020; and (4) Plaintiff's Reply is due on or before February 21, 2020. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-11-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/20/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion due by 1/17/2020. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 2/7/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/21/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-12-20 | 13 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hardy, # 2 Declaration of Vanessa Brinkmann, # 3 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2020-01-15 | 14 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-16 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is adjusted as follows: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before February 7, 2020; Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before March 6, 2020; and Plaintiff's Reply is due on or before March 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/16/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/16/2020) |
2020-01-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross Motion due by 2/7/2020. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 3/6/2020. Defendant's Reply due by 3/20/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-02-04 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |