Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
COMPLAINT against MONARCH SHIPPING CO. LTD, C. P. SCRABA, CINDY LOU TEETERS, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION filed by KURT ZAMOR. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-19
2
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KURT ZAMOR (zsb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-17
4
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-17
5
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. See order for details. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-26
6
MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, 4 Memorandum & Opinion by KURT ZAMOR (zrdj) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-29
7
ORDER denying 6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/29/2019. (zad) (Entered: 06/04/2019)