Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-19 | 1 | COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3101552), filed by Southern Environmental Law Center, Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-19 | 9 | Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Environmental Law Center (hnw) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 2 | Electronic Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued, # 2 Summons Issued)(hnw) |
2019-03-20 | 3 | Electronic Summons Issued as to Daniel Jorjani, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued, # 2 Summons Issued)(hnw) |
2019-03-20 | 4 | Electronic Summons Issued as to James Kurth, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued, # 2 Summons Issued)(hnw) |
2019-03-20 | 5 | Electronic Summons Issued as to Leopoldo Miranda, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued, # 2 Summons Issued)(hnw) |
2019-03-21 | 6 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Butler, Morgan) |
2019-03-21 | 7 | MOTION for Samuel Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3103013. by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Admission pro hac vice)(Butler, Morgan) |
2019-03-21 | 8 | MOTION for Kimberley Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3103029. by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Admission pro hac vice)(Butler, Morgan) |
2019-03-21 | 10 | ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberley Claire Hunter for Southern Environmental Law Center added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/21/19. (hnw) |
2019-03-21 | 11 | ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samuel Edward Evans for Southern Environmental Law Center added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/21/2019. (hnw) |
2019-04-24 | 12 | ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda.(Frith, Krista) |
2019-04-26 | 13 | Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (hnw) |
2019-06-06 | 14 | Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda (Frith, Krista) |
2019-08-22 | 15 | MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Count 2 by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda. (Frith, Krista) |
2019-08-22 | 16 | Brief / Memorandum in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Count 2 . filed by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Frith, Krista) |
2019-09-06 | 17 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Count 2 . filed by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Email and Attachment from Plaintiffs to Defendants, 9/24/18, # 2 Exhibit 2, Email and reply, 10/18/18, # 3 Exhibit 3, Discovery documents, # 4 Exhibit 4, additional public records, # 5 Exhibit 5, Prater Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6, Email and reply 6/7/18-6/8/18, # 7 Exhibit 7, Selection of Pending FOIA Requests before Defendants, # 8 Exhibit 8, Defendants' Vaughn Index)(Hunter, Kimberley) |
2019-09-13 | 18 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Count 2 . filed by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda. (Frith, Krista) |
2019-09-16 | 19 | MOTION to Accept Plaintiffs' Response by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Hunter, Kimberley) |
2019-09-27 | 20 | NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 19 MOTION to Accept Plaintiffs' Response , 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Count 2 and forthcoming Motion to Compel in conjunction w/ similar motions in 3:19-cv-11 : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 10:00 AM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. (ssm) |
2019-09-30 | 21 | MOTION to Compel by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Hunter, Kimberley) |
2019-09-30 | 22 | Brief / Memorandum in Support re 21 MOTION to Compel . filed by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Samuel Evans)(Hunter, Kimberley) |
2019-10-07 | 23 | MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Declaration of Samuel Evans by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Samuel Evans)(Hunter, Kimberley) |
2019-10-15 | 24 | MOTION for Summary Judgment of Count 1 by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda. (Frith, Krista) |
2019-10-15 | 25 | Brief / Memorandum in Support re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Count 1 . filed by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Frith, Krista) |
2019-10-15 | 26 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Compel . filed by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Frith, Krista) |
2019-10-29 | 27 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Count 1 . filed by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Email from McClurkin to Evans, # 2 Exhibit 2, Miranda Emails, # 3 Exhibit 3, FOIA Emails, # 4 Exhibit 4, Google docs, # 5 Exhibit 5, Key Deer Emails, # 6 Exhibit 6, Email from Arnold to Fahey, # 7 Exhibit 7, Email from Arnold to Merritt)(Hunter, Kimberley) |
2019-11-01 | 28 | Reply re 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, 25 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Count 1 . filed by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Frith, Krista) |
2019-11-04 | 29 | NOTICE by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda of Agreement with Plaintiffs Regarding Discovery (Frith, Krista) |
2019-11-04 | 30 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2019 re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Count 2 filed by James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda, Daniel Jorjani, David Bernhardt. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (ssm) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2020-01-10 | 31 | ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; granting 19 Motion to Accept Plaintiffs' Response. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/10/2020. (ssm) |
2020-01-10 | 32 | ORDER dismissing without prejudice as moot 21 Motion to Compel; and dismissing without prejudice as moot 23 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/10/2020. (ssm) |
2020-09-21 | | IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020 . Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information . (mzc) (ADI) |
2020-09-29 | | IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020 . This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password . Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc) |
2020-10-05 | | IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020 . The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking here . Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc) |
2020-12-17 | 33 | STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by David Bernhardt, Daniel Jorjani, James Kurth, Leopoldo Miranda (Frith, Krista) |
2020-12-18 | 34 | ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH Prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and striking this case from the court's active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/18/2020. (hnw) |
Hide Docket Events |
|